Stoops v. Sherman, et al.
Plaintiff: Randy Stoops
Defendant: Stuart Sherman, E. Williams, A. Jones and R. Braggs
Case Number: 1:2016cv01026
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/22/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 10/30/2017. (Flores, E)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/11/07. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/17. (Hellings, J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AS MODIFIED, Allowing Action to Proceed on Plaintiff's ADA and Negligence Claims Against Defendant Sherman Only and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/11/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of All Claims and Defendants, Except Plaintiff's ADA Claim Against Defendant Sherman 1 , 10 , 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/16. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoops v. Sherman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Braggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?