Jones v. Sherman et al
Plaintiff: William Jones
Defendant: Stuart Sherman, D. Romeo, G. Martinez and C.D.C.R.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01378
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of This Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute 14 , 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim, failure to obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/2/17. Show Cause Response due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 8 Plaintiff's Request for Emergency Injunctive Relief be DENIED signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D.C.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?