UL LLC v. Sturgeon Services International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UL LLC
Defendant: Sturgeon Services International, Inc., Engineered Well Service International, Inc. and John Powell
Case Number: 1:2016cv01389
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED CONSENT DECREE and PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/2017 ORDERING Entry of Consent Decree and Premanent Injunction Between Plaintiff UL LLC and Defendants Sturgeon Services International, Inc. and Engineered Well Service International, Inc. (Washington, S)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Vacating October 4, 2017 Hearing and Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2017. It is hereby ordered that the hearing set for October 4, 2017 is VACATED and the parties are not required to appear at that time; and The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate the motion to compel filed September 13, 2017. (Valdez, E)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/01/17 ORERING that the Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 10/09/17. (Benson, A.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re Stipulation to Continue the Non-Expert Discovery Deadline, as Limited in the Parties' Stipulation 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/1/17. (Case Management Deadline: 10/9/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/17 ORDERING that the instant action is STAYED only as to the cross-complaint against Rynders filed by Defendants Surgeon Services International, Inc. and Engineered Well Services International, Inc. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UL LLC v. Sturgeon Services International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UL LLC
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Bykerk
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturgeon Services International, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence Todd Egland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineered Well Service International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?