Hunt v. Matevousian et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Hunt
Defendant: Andre Matevousian, Helling, W. Gunn and Graham
Case Number: 1:2016cv01560
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/14/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Second 43 Motion to Reopen Case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/29/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 41 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Motion for Stay of Proceedings as Moot 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/9/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING 16 Screening Order of November 17, 2017; AMENDED Screening Order and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 1 Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/14/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action, without Prejudice, for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute re 16 , 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/29/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within 14 Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Court's Screening Order 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2017: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Screen Complaint or Reassign Matter signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case 10 ; ORDER Vacating Voluntary Dismissal and Directing Clerk of Court to Reopen Case No. 1:16-cv-01560-LJO-BAM (PC), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/28/16. CASE REOPENED. (Verduzco, M)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 7 Request for Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/2/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Matevousian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Matevousian
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helling
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Gunn
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?