Smith v. Hutchinson et al

Plaintiff: Toy Terrell Smith
Defendant: R.M. Hutchinson, J. Lewis, J. Torres, M. Hoggard, J. Gallagher and J. Acebedo
Case Number: 1:2016cv01924
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER DENYING 66 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER GRANTING 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/9/19. (Marrujo, C)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Requiring Parties to Submit Confidential Settlement Statements; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Email Copy of Order to Litigation Coordinator, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT INMATE Toy Terrell Smith, CDCR# D-92679 on January 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. at CSP-Corcoran, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/14/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/3/19. Seven Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 52 be granted and that Defendant Acebedo's Motion for Summary Judgment 39 be denied as moot signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/11/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 42 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/5/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Compel production of documents. ORDER directing Defendants to submit documents for in camera review. Filing Deadline: 12/13/2018. ORDER denying Misc. Motions 44 , 48 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/23/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Dismiss Defendant J. Acebedo; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny 39 Defendant J. Acebedo's Motion for Summary Judgment as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/20/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/4/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/2018. This action shall proceed against J. Torres, M. Hoggard and J. Acebedo. (Jessen, A)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Requesting Response Regarding Prisoner's Non-Appearance for Court-Ordered Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/7/2018. 14-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 10 Claims Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 1/12/2018. (Flores, E)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion to Object the Dismissal of Claims Against Defendants R.M. Hutchinson and J. Gallagher signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/16/2017. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toy Terrell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.M. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Acebedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?