Bisel v. Fisher et al
Petitioner: Gregory Eugene Bisel
Respondent: Ray Fisher, Jr. and Scott Kernan
Case Number: 1:2017cv00013
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/2020. (Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 41 Motion to Disqualify Respondents;ORDER ADOPTING 44 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER referring this matter back to Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/18/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Respondent's 42 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/27/2020. Referred to Judge Drozd; Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to DENY 41 Motion for Default; Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/23/2019. Objections to F&R due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 28 Petitioner's Motion to Lift Stay; ORDER GRANTING 29 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit; and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to File Amended Petition (Doc. 30 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2019. (Jessen, A)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 23 Motion for Leave to Extend Stay and Abeyance, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/10/18. (Gonzalez, R)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 19 Motion for Leave to Accept Habeas Corpus Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/25/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 2 Motion for Stay and Abeyance, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/29/17. (Marrujo, C)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Supplement His Motion for Stay and Abeyance (Doc. 2 ) Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING 1 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:16-cv-2976 DB) to Fresno (1:17-cv-0013 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/3/17. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bisel v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Eugene Bisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?