Driver v. U.S. Special Master et al
Plaintiff: Billy Driver
Defendant: U.S. Special Master, Clark Kelso, U.S. Dept. of State Hospitals, U.S. Dept. of Justice and U.S. Court of Federal Claims
Case Number: 1:2017cv00202
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 13 & 14 Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Motions signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/24/2020. (Jessen, A)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, Without Prejudice, for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With the Court's Order of May 2, 2017, and Failure to Pay the Filing Fee re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and Requiring Plaintiff to Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee to Proceed with this action; this matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate for proceedings consistent with this order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/01/17. (45-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/22/2017 recommending that 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS be denied. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver v. U.S. Special Master et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Special Master
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of State Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Court of Federal Claims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?