Carter v. Voong, et al.
Plaintiff: Dominic Carter
Defendant: H. Flores, S. Longoria, C. Brown, M Bejarano, D. Goree, R. Godwin, A. Pacillas, M. Voong and R Pimentel
Case Number: 1:2017cv00245
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 27 Motion for a Settlement Status Update, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/22/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/21/2017. (Flores, E)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Following Settlement; VACATING Dates, and DIRECTING Parties to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/13/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on June 9, 2017 at 8:30a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/10/17. Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2017 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison. (Gonzalez, R)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case Proceed Against Defendants Longoria and Flores on a Claim for Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed With Prejudice re 1 Notice of Removal signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/11/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Request for Screening Order and Setting Deadline for Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/23/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Voong, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Flores
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Longoria
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Brown
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Bejarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Goree
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Godwin
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pacillas
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?