Gonzales v. Rutledge et al
Plaintiff: Gerardo Gonzales
Defendant: Bill Rutledge, Cory Taylor, W.S. Wahl, Janet Fay Hastings, Brooke A. Hastings, Bob Hastings, Dennis Sterk, Paulette Drake, Velda Murillo and Brad Darling
Case Number: 1:2017cv00387
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Forward Motion to Withdraw to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals; ORDER Denying 18 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal as Moot signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/11/2018. (Flores, E)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/17: 14-Day Deadline.(Hellings, J)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING 4 Findings and Recommendations Recommending That Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees Or Costs be Denied; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Pay the Filing Fee in Full to Proceed With This Action Within Thirty Days, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/17. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 5 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations; Declaration of Gerardo Gonzales with Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Be Denied 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of DISQUALIFYING Magistrate Judge and Reassigning Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/17: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings, New Case No. 1:17-cv-00387 LJO BAM. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Rutledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.S. Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Fay Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke A. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Sterk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velda Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?