Lipsey v. Reddy et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lipsey, Jr.
Defendant: Reddy, Smith, Ortiz, Kalil, K. Spencer, R. Hernandez, J. Mancilla, S. Celedon and R. De La Rosa
Case Number: 1:2017cv00569
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Relief From Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60 (b), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/12/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 83 Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b) and Request for Civil Penalties and/or Exemplary Damages, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/12/19. (Gonzalez, R)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER OVERRULING 76 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING 77 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Alteration or Amendment of the Judgment and/or Motion; and ORDER DENYIN 78 Plaintiff's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 and 60(b) Motions signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/25/2019. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to strike unauthorized Surreply 65 and denying Plaintiff's Motion to deny Motion to strike 66 ; striking Plaintiff's Surreplies 64 , 72 . FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants ' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT for the failure to exhaust administrative remedies, be granted 45 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/6/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 70 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/6/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 67 Motion in Opposition to Defendants' Interrogatories, Set One, as Unnecessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/26/18. (Marrujo, C)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request to Allow Him to Waive Discovery and Proceed to Jury Trial 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey Court Order 60 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey Court Order 45 , 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction 49 , 51 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/29/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Regarding Parties' Stipulation; ORDER STAYING All Non-Exhaustion Discovery 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/27/2018: The parties' stipulated motion to stay all non-exhaustion related discovery 55 is GRANTED. (Hellings, J)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Settlement Conference 52 , 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER STRIKING 42 Plaintiff's Reply to Answer and ORDER Requiring Defendants to Respond to Settlement Conference Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/12/2018. (Jessen, A)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Plaintiff's 49 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/04/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/22/2018. (Flores, E)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Copies of Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/1/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 30 Motion to Strike as Unnecessary; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants, with any Objections Due within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Discharging 24 Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to File Second Amended Complaint 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Submit Copies of the Endorsed Complaint Filed on April 24, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/17. Thirty-Day Show Cause Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Adopting 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims for Improper Venue and Joinder; ORDER Adopting 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims for the Failure to State a Cognizable Claim, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Strike Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/7/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Expedited Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/05/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims, without Prejudice; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/6/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00569-LJO-BAM(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipsey v. Reddy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lipsey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mancilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Celedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. De La Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?