Miller v. Navarro et al
Plaintiff: |
Gerald Lee Miller |
Defendant: |
J. Navarro, C. Torress, Cagle, Medina, Florse, Marquez, Xayoudom and Gonzalves |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv01309 |
Filed: |
October 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Kings |
Presiding Judge: |
Stanley A. Boone |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 13, 2020 |
Filing
39
ORDER ADOPTING 36 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment, GRANTING Defendants' 29 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and DISMISSING Action for Failure to Exhaust, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/12/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 13, 2019 |
Filing
36
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Correct Spelling of Defendant Flores' Name; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Granting in Part and Denying in Part Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment 28 , 29 , 32 , and this Action be Dismissed without Prejudice 15 ; Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/13/2019. Objections to F&R due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
|
August 21, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Claim 18 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/21/2018: This action now proceeds only on plaintiff's claim brought against defendants Florse, Marquez, and Xayoudom for retaliation in violation of the First Amendment; Plaintiff's claims against defendant Navarro for deliberate indifference in violation of the Eighth Amendment and retaliation in violation of the First Amendment are dismissed, without prejudice, as improperly joined; This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for issuance of service of process. (Hellings, J)
|
April 10, 2018 |
Filing
18
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants 15 , 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
10
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants for Failure to State a Claim and Improperly Joined Under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Severing Action re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/28/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?