Ruiz v. Arakaki
Plaintiff: Rogelio May Ruiz
Defendant: L. Arakaki, F. Hanna, A. Renteria, Smith and L. Romero
Case Number: 1:2017cv01404
Filed: October 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 55 Findings and Recommendation, GRANTING 47 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/30/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 47 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/7/2020. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/25/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Directing Defendants to Re-Serve Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff at New Address of Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/2019. 10-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Adopting 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Defendants' 35 Motion to Dismiss, and DIRECTING that further Response be Filed within Fourteen Days signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/18/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 35 Motion to Dismiss the Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/17/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 9/20/2018. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Arakaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio May Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Arakaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?