Santos Valenzuela v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Santos Valenzuela
Defendant: Smith, Kern Valley State Prison Warden, C.D.C.R. Director, Delano Regional Medical Center Director, Jerry Brown, Jr., California Medical Board Orthopedic Surgeons and The City Counsel for the City of Delano
Case Number: 1:2017cv01440
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Action be DISMISSED for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief re 46 Second Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER VACATING 33 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2019. (Jessen, A)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/8/19. Second Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Adopting 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, and DENYING Plaintiff's 34 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/15/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, filed December 7, 2018, be denied re 34 ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/18. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 32 Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING November 13, 2018 29 Findings and Recommendations, and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief and Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to This Action - CASE ASSIGNED to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. New Case No. 1:17-cv-01440 DAD SAB (PC); FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to Comply With a Court Order 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/30/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with a court order 15 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/2018. Show Cause Response due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos Valenzuela v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Valley State Prison Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D.C.R. Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delano Regional Medical Center Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Board Orthopedic Surgeons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Counsel for the City of Delano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?