S.B., et al v. California Department of Education, et al.

Plaintiff: S. B., Kristina B. and Michael B.
Defendant: California Department of Education and The State of California
Case Number: 1:2017cv01507
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/23/2018. The scheduling conference currently set for 8/16/2018 is CONTINUED to 9/27/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties may appear at the scheduling conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 319086. (Thorp, J)
April 20, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS FAC AND MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 20, 2018. MOTIONS to DISMISS 25 28 set for 6/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Munoz, I)
March 27, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 26, 2018. (Munoz, I)
March 6, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/17/2018 is moved to 6/28/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/6/2018. (Kusamura, W)
January 4, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND CONTINUING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2018 is CONTINUED to 5/17/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/4/2018. (Thorp, J)
November 15, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Petition for Guardians Ad Litem signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.B., et al v. California Department of Education, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B.
Represented By: Christian Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina B.
Represented By: Christian Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B.
Represented By: Christian Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Education
Represented By: Kate Starn Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Represented By: Julia R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?