DeFilippo v. County of Stanislaus et al

Plaintiff: Georgia DeFilippo and Christina DeFilippo
Defendant: County of Stanislaus, City of Modesto, City of Turlock, City of Ceres, Birgit Fladager, Marlissa Ferreira, Kirk Bunch, Steve Jacobson, Dale Lingerfelt, Frolian Mariscal, Lloyd Mackinnon, Jon Evers, Derek Perry, Cory Brown, Greg Jones, Timothy Redd, Kenneth Barringer and Frank Navarro
Case Number: 1:2018cv00496
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1) The present action shall be stayed for an additional ninety (90) days; 2) The hearing on Defendants City of Turlock, Timothy Redd, and Frank Navarro's Motion to Dismiss, presently set for October 1, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, shall be vacated and reset to January 28, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard; 3) The deadline for Defendants City of Modesto and Jon Evers to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs 9; complaint shall be set to sixty (60) days after the stay is lifted; 4) The deadline for Defendants County of Stanislaus, Birgit Fladager, Marlissa Ferreira, Kirk Bunch, Steve Jacobson, Dale Lingerfelt, Froilan Mariscal, Llyod Mackinnon, Cory Brown , Greg Jones, and Kenneth Barringer ("Stanislaus Defendants") to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' complaint shall be set to sixty (60) days after the stay is lifted; 5) The initial mandatory scheduling conference set for Decem ber 10, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Erica P. Grosjean shall be vacated and reset as soon as practicable after the parties notify the court that the criminal proceedings have been resolved. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/12/2018. (Rooney, M)
July 13, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING a stay of this action for ninety days pursuant to the parties' stipulation, document 20 . The Motion to Dismiss currently noticed for hearing on 7/23/2018 before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii is CONTINUED and will now be held o n 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/24/2018 will now be held on 12/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 1, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT 10 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/2018. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (ECF No. 10), and good cause shown, the stipulation is granted. The time for the Stanislaus Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to August 31, 2018. (Thorp, J)
May 30, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/30/2018. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the time for the Modesto Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to August 31, 2018. (Thorp, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeFilippo v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Turlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birgit Fladager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlissa Ferreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Lingerfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frolian Mariscal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Mackinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Barringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia DeFilippo
Represented By: J Gary Gwilliam
Represented By: Jayme L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina DeFilippo
Represented By: J Gary Gwilliam
Represented By: Jayme L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?