Dillingham v. Emerson
Plaintiff: Jerry Dillingham
Defendant: N Emerson, S. Martines, E Wilson, S. Wescoat, D. Valesco, Lofflen, Marsh, D. Ibarra, D Smith, J. Zamora, J. Corral, S. Morelock, Olga, Rodriguez, C. Ramos, S. Sherman and Scott Kernan
Case Number: 1:2018cv00507
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING 90 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Administrative Relief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2020. (Rivera, O)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Adminstrative Relief be Denied re 88 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Jerry Dillingham ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/2020. (Objections to F&R due within 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fifth 83 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 2, 2020 Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/10/2020. (Jessen, A)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Jerry Dillingham, CDCR# C-95149, By Video Conference (Via Zoom), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2020. (Rivera, O)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REQUIRING Remote Appearances at Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/2020. (Rivera, O)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fourth 74 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, without Prejudice, and Denying Request for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/12/2020. (Flores, E)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING CASE for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/30/2020. Settlement Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Flores, E)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 69 Request for Entry of Default and 70 Motion for Administrative Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/01/2020. (Flores, E)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Requiring Defendants Velasco, Martinez, Loftin, Emerson, Marsh, Wescoat, and Wilson to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2020. Responsive Pleading due within 14 days. (Rivera, O)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 61 Findings and Recommendation, and Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 54 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/20/20. Referred Back to Magistrate Judge. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 64 Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order Directing Defendants to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/7/2020. (Jessen, A)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Correct Spelling of Defendants Velasaco's and Loftin's Names; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 54 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2019. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 Motion for Administrative Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/13/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Certain Defendants and Claims be Dismissed for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/2019: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Issued on September 19, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel 37 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/24/2018. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Without Prejudice 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/25/2018. (Hellings, J)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Certain Defendants and Claims Be Dismissed for the Failure to State a Cognizable Claim 10 , 30 , 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillingham v. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Martines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Wescoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Valesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lofflen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Corral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Morelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?