May 16, 2022 |
Filing
199
ORDER VACATING JURY TRIAL and DISMISSING CASE Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/16/22. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
|
May 11, 2022 |
Filing
198
ORDER DENYING 196 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear at Trial via Zoom and Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause. Plaintiff is ordered to notify the Court in writing by 5:00 pm on Friday, May 13, 2022 that he intends to be personally present in the courtroom to proceed with the jury trial in this case on May 17, 2022. Signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2022. (Hernandez, M)
|
May 4, 2022 |
Filing
190
AMENDED ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and Setting Status Conference, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/03/2022. Trial Status Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Maldonado, C)
|
April 6, 2022 |
Filing
181
ORDER DENYING 174 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint A Guardian Ad Litem signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/6/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
|
January 12, 2022 |
Filing
168
ORDER re Pending Recusal, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/11/2022. (Maldonado, C)
|
September 20, 2021 |
Filing
158
ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 157 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/17/2021.(Flores, E)
|
August 4, 2021 |
Filing
156
ORDER DENYING 155 Plaintiff's Second Request for Appointment of an Expert Witness, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/04/2021. (Maldonado, C)
|
May 21, 2021 |
Filing
151
ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Jerry Dillingham, CDCR No. C-95149, to be produced for video conference set for June 29, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/21/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
|
April 12, 2021 |
Filing
149
ORDER ADOPTING 143 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/9/2021. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 25, 2021 |
Filing
147
ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, REAPPOINTING M. GREG MULLANAX AS LIMITED PURPOSE COUNSEL, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/25/2021. ( REMOTE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 6/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
March 3, 2021 |
Filing
145
ORDER Requesting that the Warden of Kern Valley State Prison Reply to Plaintiff's 144 Response to Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order, the Order to Show Cause 141 , and Plaintiff's Response to the Order to show Cause 144 to Senior Assistant Attorney General Monica Anderson and the Warden of Kern Valley State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/02/2021. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
|
February 23, 2021 |
Filing
143
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Emergency 142 Motion for Administrative Relief be Denied; ORDER Granting Plaintiff Thirty-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/23/2021. Referred to Judge Unassigned; Objections to F&R due within Thirty-Days. (Flores, E)
|
January 27, 2021 |
Filing
141
ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why he Should not be Sanctioned for Failing to Appear at the Second Settlement Conference; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 139 Motion to Vacate or Reset the Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/27/2021. Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
|
January 4, 2021 |
Filing
134
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM FOR Jerry Dillingham, CDCR# C-95149 on Tuesday, January 26, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. by Zoom Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/3/2021(Martin-Gill, S)
|
October 28, 2020 |
Filing
133
ORDER GRANTING 132 Defendant's Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, to Vacate and Re-Set the Expert Disclosures Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/28/2020. (Rivera, O)
|
October 15, 2020 |
Filing
131
ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/15/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The settlement conference will be conducted by remote means, to be determined at a later date and time. (Rivera, O)
|
September 28, 2020 |
Filing
130
ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Participate in Second Settlement Conference; ORDER APPOINTING Limited Purpose Counsel for Settlement; ORDER VACATING the Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing, the Trial, and all Related Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/28/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 20, 2020 |
Filing
126
ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's 115 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/2020. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 19, 2020 |
Filing
125
ORDER re: Plaintiff's 123 Letter of Transmittal Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/19/2020. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 18, 2020 |
Filing
124
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 122 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Administrative Relief be DENIED and All Future Requests for Injunctive Relief that Plaintiff Files be Summarily Denied if they are Clearly Unrelated to this Case re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/18/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
|
July 2, 2020 |
Filing
117
ORDER DENYING 116 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Directing the Clerk of Court to Serve Copies of this Order on Listed Individuals/Entities signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/1/2020. (Jessen, A)
|
June 29, 2020 |
Filing
114
ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer Regarding Whether a Second Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2020. Statement due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
|
May 28, 2020 |
Filing
112
ORDER DENYING 89 Plaintiff's Requests for Appointment of Expert Witness, for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem, and to Stay the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/27/2020. (Rivera, O)
|
May 18, 2020 |
Filing
111
ORDER ADOPTING 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/15/2020. Defendant Garcia has fourteen days from the date of this order to file his answer. (Rivera, O)
|
April 15, 2020 |
Filing
110
ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's 82 , 86 , 90 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Orders, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/15/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
March 16, 2020 |
Filing
107
ORDER GRANTING 106 Defendant's Renewed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/16/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
January 8, 2020 |
Filing
98
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 96 Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Interrogatory, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/8/2020. ( Response due within THIRTY (30) DAYS.) (Orozco, A)
|
December 16, 2019 |
Filing
88
ORDER DENYING Defendant's 87 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/16/2019. (Orozco, A)
|
December 5, 2019 |
Filing
85
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to DENY Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Amend the Complaint, GRANT in Part and DENY in Part 35 Motion to Dismiss, and DENY 84 Motion for Order Directing Defendant to File Answer; Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/4/2019. Objections to F&R if any due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
|
November 18, 2019 |
Filing
83
ORDER RE: Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Official Information Privilege, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/15/2019. 30-Day Deadline. (Orozco, A)
|
October 24, 2019 |
Filing
79
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 78 Motion for a Copy of the Scheduliing Conference Transcript, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/23/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 27, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER DISCHARGING WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM 60 as to Inmate Jerry Dillingham, CDCR #C-95149, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/27/19. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 1, 2019 |
Filing
62
ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Administrative Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/31/19. (Gonzalez, R)
|
July 25, 2019 |
Filing
60
ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Jerry Dillingham, CDCR# C-95149, Plaintiff's Witness on August 27, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. at Bakersfield, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/25/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 23, 2019 |
Filing
59
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Expedited Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/22/19. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 11, 2019 |
Filing
57
ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel for Settlement Purposes and for Confidential Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Filing
56
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2019. ( Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
June 24, 2019 |
Filing
51
ORDER APPOINTING Limited Purpose Counsel for Settlement, DIRECTING Counsel to Meet and Confer RE: Setting a Settlement Conference, and STAYING CASE; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff's Counsel a Copy of this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/24/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 3, 2019 |
Filing
47
ORDER on Plaintiff's 46 Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/31/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
April 24, 2019 |
Filing
38
ORDER on Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Administrative Relief; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of Docket Sheet, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/24/19. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 23, 2019 |
Filing
37
ORDER Regarding Early Settlement Conference; ORDER Directing Clerk to Serve Supervising Deputy Attorney General Christopher Decker with a Copy of Plaintiff's Complaint 1 , The Screening Order 17 , 21 and this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/23/19. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 10, 2019 |
Filing
32
ORDER DENYING 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/9/2019. (Jessen, A)
|
January 10, 2019 |
Filing
21
ORDER Adopting 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Motions signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
17
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this 1 Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant Garcia for Conspiracy, Retaliation in Violation of the First Amendment, and Excessive Force and Failure to Protect in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and that all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/27/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Sant Agata, S)
|
July 20, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion and Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel 1 & 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/2018: Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|