(PC) Bowersock v. Kernan et al

Plaintiff: Mark M. Bowersock
Defendant: M. Rodrigues, A Williams, Scott Kernan, Stuart Sherman and C. Ramos
Case Number: 1:2018cv01040
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Mark M. Bowersock. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/18. Consent or Decline due by 10/15/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
August 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Mark M. Bowersock. (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/18. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Mark M. Bowersock. (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2018 Filing 15 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2018 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01484.
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 Case transferred to District of Eastern Distict of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern Distict of California*.*501 I Street, Room 4-200**Sacramento, CA 95814-7300*. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/02/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark M. Bowersock. (jms) [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes assigned to transfer case from California Northern District. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms) [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-03057. Original file received electronically [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Remark: Civil Case File Electronically Transferred to the Southern District of California. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 6/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff regarding recent filings. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark M. Bowersock.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark M. Bowersock. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Scott Kernan, C. Ramos, M. Rodrigues, Stuart Sherman, A. Williams. Filed byMark M. Bowersock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/2/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 7/2/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST For Correspondence Approval With Legal Assistant James Vansickle For Medical-Legal Purposes by Mark M. Bowersock. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) Modified on 5/23/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/24/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from casd on 8/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bowersock v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark M. Bowersock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?