(PC) Daniels v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Sonya Marie Daniels
Defendant: J. Harry, A. Della Porta, K. Lewis, Garcia, Tegtmeyer, Turner, R. Perez, D. K. Johnson, M. Scoggins and Sandra Ramey
Case Number: 1:2018cv01160
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Docket Annotation served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TERMINATING #7 Motion to Proceed IFP ; Previous Motion for IFP Granted on 09/06/2018 with Order #5 . (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:18-cv-01160-LJO-SAB (PC). (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CIW Prison, 16756 Chino Corona Rd, Corona, CA 92880 by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Flores, E)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/06/2018. (Attachments: #1 Application for IFP) (Flores, E)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Hellings, J)
August 29, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Jessen, A)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sonya Marie Daniels.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Daniels v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Della Porta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegtmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Marie Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?