(HC) Patterson v. Sherman

Petitioner: Vester L. Patterson
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01688
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #4 by Petitioner Vester L. Patterson. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vester L. Patterson. (Gonzalez, R)
December 20, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Vester L. Patterson. (Marrujo, C)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Dismissed as Unauthorized Successive Petition; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign Case to District Judge (new case number is 1:18-cv-01688-DAD-JDP), signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/20/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
December 13, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Vester L. Patterson. (Flores, E)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Vester L. Patterson signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/13/2018. (Flores, E)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Stu Sherman by Vester L. Patterson.(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Patterson v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vester L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?