(PC) Carter v. California Correctional Institution et al
Plaintiff: Keith Reagan Carter
Defendant: T. Gonzalez, California Correctional Institution, B. Mello, J. Sullivan, L. Lundy, T. Reed and D. Wadkins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00358
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION requesting Marshal Service Forms by Keith Reagan Carter. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Sierra Conservation Center, 5150 O'Byrnes Ferry Road, Jamestown, CA 95327 by Keith Reagan Carter. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keith Reagan Carter. (Hellings, J)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal by T. Gonzalez, L. Lundy, B. Mello, T. Reed, J. Sullivan, D. Wadkins re #1 Notice of Removal. (Duggan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Keith Reagan Carter. (Sant Agata, S)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-18-101910 by B. Mello, J. Sullivan, T Reed, Wadkins, Ludy, Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Duggan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8164175. (Duggan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee (Duggan, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Carter v. California Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gonzalez
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Mello
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sullivan
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lundy
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Reed
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Wadkins
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Reagan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?