Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC v. Brian Glover, et al

Plaintiff: Milo Eugene Watson, Verdi S. Boyer, Stanley R. Hughes, Patricia A. Watson, Fred Porter, Annette L. Davis, BRRI Investments, Annette Davis, Michael Duncan, James A. Bock, George R. Smith, Jr., Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Brent Cruz, Misty Cruz, Anthony E. Hogg, Arthur Davis, David K. Bodke, Bebebo, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr., Jennifer Duncan, Anita B. Hashim and Bart A. Wallace
Defendant: Brian Glover, Newmark Grubb ASU & Associates, Mark Smith, Gregory Roderick, Mesa Senior Living Community, LLC/Courtyard Towers, Frontier Management, The Roderick Family LLC and Bide, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00379
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
2 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has reviewed preliminarily the five separate motions to dismiss (only one of which incorporates another by reference) filed in this matter. At this time, the Court believes the motions may be suitable for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the hearing on the motions, currently set for June 27, 2019, is VACATED. Should the Court conclude a hearing would be helpful or necessary, it will re-set the matter. The Parties are warned that, while the Court attempts to rule on civil motions as quickly as possible, it normally addresses non-emergency motions in the order in which they were submitted for decision. Because there is a dire shortage of judicial resources in this District, there is a significant civil motions backlog. At least twenty civil motions await decision ahead of those filed in this case. The Parties may therefore wish to reconsider consent to the magistrate judge. In addition, in order to facilitate review of the multiple pending motions in this matter, the parties are directed to cooperate in the production and delivery to the Clerk's Office of a single three-ring binder containing an organized set of courtesy copies of the motions papers. The documents may be produced double sided and should be delivered within ten (10) business days of entry of this Minute Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 21, 2019. (Munoz, I)
June 20, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY by Brian Glover re #27 Opposition to Motion,,,. (Wynkoop, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY by Newmark Grubb ASU & Associates re #23 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kruthers, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY by Mark Smith to RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to DISMISS. (Lennemann, Lawrence)
June 20, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Bide, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company re #26 Opposition to Motion,,,. (Wynkoop, Todd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY by Frontier Management, Gregory Roderick, The Roderick Family LLC re #28 Opposition to Motion,,,. Attorney Forsyth, Batya Floryn added. (Forsyth, Batya)
June 13, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson in re #23 Motion to Dismiss. (Georgeson, C.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 OPPOSITION by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson to #23 MOTION to DISMISS. (Georgeson, C.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 OPPOSITION by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson to #21 MOTION to DISMISS. (Georgeson, C.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson to #25 MOTION to DISMISS. (Georgeson, C.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 OPPOSITION by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson to #24 MOTION to DISMISS. (Georgeson, C.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to DISMISS by Brian Glover. Attorney Wynkoop, Todd A. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6))(Wynkoop, Todd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to DISMISS by Bide, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Attorney Wynkoop, Todd A. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6))(Wynkoop, Todd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to DISMISS by Newmark Grubb ASU & Associates. Attorney Kruthers, Mark D. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Kruthers, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Frontier Management, Roderick Family LLC and Gregory Roderick In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Frontier Management, Gregory Roderick, The Roderick Family LLC re #21 MOTION to DISMISS filed by The Roderick Family LLC, Gregory Roderick, Frontier Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to the Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to the Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Donner, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to DISMISS by Frontier Management, Gregory Roderick, The Roderick Family LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Donner, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Bide, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company on 5/29/2019, Answer due 7/29/2019 (Georgeson, C.)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss, the Scheduling Conference is reset from 6/25/2019 to 9/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2019. (Hernandez, M)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION OF HEARING DATES AND EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion to Dismiss, #11 , currently set for 4/25/2019, is CONTINUED to 6/27/2019, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/17/2019. (Timken, A)
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Consolidation of Hearing Dates and Extension of Briefing Schedule, and Order by Frontier Management. (Marchini, Joseph)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Frontier Management, Gregory Roderick, The Roderick Family LLC to #11 MOTION to DISMISS. (Marchini, Joseph)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson. (Georgeson, C.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by BRRI Investments, Bebebo, LLC, James A. Bock, David K. Bodke, Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the John David Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Mark Joel Fritch Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Verdi S. Boyer(as trustee of the Jillian Laura Fritch-Stump Irrevocable Trust dated November 11, 2015, one-third (1/3) of assignor's interest), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Brent Cruz and Misty Cruz Family Trust of 2010), Brent Cruz(as trustee of the Entrust Group FBO Brent Cruz IRA#72-30012530), Misty Cruz, Annette Davis, Annette L. Davis, Arthur Davis, Jennifer Duncan, Michael Duncan, Anita B. Hashim, Anthony E. Hogg, Stanley R. Hughes, Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC, Richard A. Owens, Sr, Fred Porter, George R. Smith, Jr, Bart A. Wallace, Milo Eugene Watson, Patricia A. Watson to #11 MOTION to DISMISS. (Georgeson, C.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Frontier Management, Gregory Roderick, The Roderick Family LLC. (Marchini, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Frontier Management re #8 Civil New Case Documents for LJO. (Marchini, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS by Mark Smith. Attorney Lennemann, Lawrence James added. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Lennemann, Lawrence)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Newmark Grubb ASU & Associates. (Fischbach, Donald)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Newmark Grubb ASU & Associates. Attorney Fischbach, Donald R. added. (Fischbach, Donald)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the reassignment order, the scheduling conference will now be heard on 6/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling conference report is due seven days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/26/2019. (Hernandez, M)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Disqualifying Magistrate Judge and Reassigning Case signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/25/2019. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:19-cv-00379-LJO-SAB. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Frontier Management, an Oregon Limited Liability Company, Gregory Roderick, an individual, The Roderick Family LLC, a California Limited Liability Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Marchini, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Frontier Management, an Oregon Limited Liability Company, Gregory Roderick, an individual, The Roderick Family LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Marchini, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Frontier Management, an Oregon Limited Liability Company, Gregory Roderick, an individual, The Roderick Family LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Marchini, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-19-100144 by All Parties. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8172542) (Marchini, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC v. Brian Glover, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milo Eugene Watson
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verdi S. Boyer
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley R. Hughes
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Watson
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Porter
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette L. Davis
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRRI Investments
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Davis
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Duncan
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Bock
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George R. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lantz Retirement Investments, LLC
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Cruz
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Cruz
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Hogg
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Davis
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K. Bodke
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bebebo, LLC
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Owens, Sr.
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Duncan
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita B. Hashim
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart A. Wallace
Represented By: C. Russell Georgeson
Represented By: Richard Alan Belardinelli
Represented By: Robert James Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Glover
Represented By: Todd A. Wynkoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmark Grubb ASU & Associates
Represented By: Mark D. Kruthers
Represented By: Donald R. Fischbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Smith
Represented By: Lawrence James Lennemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Roderick
Represented By: Joseph Michael Marchini
Represented By: Patrick S. Loi
Represented By: Michael F. Donner
Represented By: Batya Floryn Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Senior Living Community, LLC/Courtyard Towers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Management
Represented By: Joseph Michael Marchini
Represented By: Patrick S. Loi
Represented By: Michael F. Donner
Represented By: Batya Floryn Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roderick Family LLC
Represented By: Joseph Michael Marchini
Represented By: Patrick S. Loi
Represented By: Michael F. Donner
Represented By: Batya Floryn Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bide, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Todd A. Wynkoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?