Home Care Association of America et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al
Plaintiff: California Association for Health Service at Home and Home Care Association of America
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Kimberly Johnson and Service Employees International Union Local 2015
Case Number: 1:2019cv00929
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY by Service Employees International Union Local 2015 re #8 MOTION to INTERVENE . (Kushner, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order adopting stipulation in part as to briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/2019. (Simultaneous Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 10/28/2019; Responses due by 11/22/2019; Replies due by 12/18/2019; Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Rosales, O.)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re stipulated request for dismissal as to Defendant Gavin Newsome without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/2019. Gavin Newsom (in his official capacity as Governor of California) terminated. (Rosales, O.)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/19. Added attorney Maurice Baskin, PHV for California Association for Health Service at Home and Home Care Association of America. (Gonzalez, R)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date by Xavier Becerra, Kimberly Johnson, Gavin Newsom. (Goldstein, Seth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION by California Association for Health Service at Home, Home Care Association of America to #8 MOTION to INTERVENE . Attorney MacMillan, Joanne Elizabeth added. (MacMillan, Joanne)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Home Care Association of America for attorney Maurice Baskin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8423440) (Eddings, Ryan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Dismissal of Governor Gavin Newsom by Gavin Newsom. (Goldstein, Seth)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Kimberly Johnson, Gavin Newsom to #8 MOTION to INTERVENE . (Goldstein, Seth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER by Xavier Becerra, Kimberly Johnson, Gavin Newsom.(Goldstein, Seth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Danielle Leonard on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 2015. Attorney Leonard, Danielle added. (Leonard, Danielle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott A. Kronland on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 2015. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to INTERVENE by Service Employees International Union Local 2015. Attorney Kushner, Andrew Edward added. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Brandi Wolf, #3 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #4 Proposed Order)(Kushner, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Kimberly Johnson, Gavin Newsom. (Goldstein, Seth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Seth E. Goldstein on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Kimberly Johnson, Gavin Newsom. Attorney Goldstein, Seth E. added. (Goldstein, Seth)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Sarchet, Bruce)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Kimberly Johnson, Gavin Newsom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce J. Sarchet* *Littler Mendelson* *500 Capitol Mall, Suite 2000* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs California Association for Health Service at Home, Home Care Association of America. (Sarchet, Bruce)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Injunctive Relief against All Defendants by Home Care Association of America, California Association for Health Service at Home. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8343473) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarchet, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Care Association of America et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Association for Health Service at Home
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet
Represented By: Ryan Lee Eddings
Represented By: Maurice Baskin, PHV
Represented By: Joanne Elizabeth MacMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Care Association of America
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet
Represented By: Ryan Lee Eddings
Represented By: Maurice Baskin, PHV
Represented By: Joanne Elizabeth MacMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Seth E. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Seth E. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Johnson
Represented By: Seth E. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 2015
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Danielle Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?