(PC) Patterson v. HIP-C Committee, et al.
Plaintiff: Vester L. Patterson
Defendant: HIP-C Committe, California Correctional Health Care Services and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01401
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Vester L. Patterson. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application -Prisoner) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Vester L. Patterson. (Orozco, A)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider emailed to COR.filings@cdcr.ca.gov. for V. Patterson. (Lundstrom, T)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Vester L. Patterson, CDC K-58564 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/7/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Vester L. Patterson. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR) and HIP-C Committe by Vester L. Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Patterson v. HIP-C Committee, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIP-C Committe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vester L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?