(HC) Ruiz v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Joey Robert Ruiz
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2021cv00575
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joey Robert Ruiz. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Joey Robert Ruiz signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/6/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-08594.
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/6/2021. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joey Robert Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Copy of #2 and #3 mailed to petitioner. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/11/2021. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee not paid.). Filed byJoey Robert Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Ruiz v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joey Robert Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?