(PC) Martin v. De La Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Jared Andrew Martin
Defendant: De La Cruz, Christian Pfeiffer, Kathleen Allison and County of Kern
Case Number: 1:2022cv00812
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Gonzalez, R)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge, served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Gonzalez, R)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #11 by Plaintiff Jared Andrew Martin. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Impeach a Judge Magistrate by Jared Andrew Martin. (Lawrence, A)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2022. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jared Andrew Martin. (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-00812-DAD-SAB (PC). (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Lawrence, A)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2022. Amended Complaint due within Thirty (30) Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Screening Order served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Sant Agata, S)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by the Madera County Sheriff, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jared Andrew Martin. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION for Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jared Martin. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, County of Kern, De La Cruz, Christian Pfeiffer by Jared Andrew Martin.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Martin v. De La Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Andrew Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?