(PC) Crane v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Richard Joseph Crane
Defendant: G. Lopez, Debbie Asuncion, Daniel Sanchez, M. Contreras and Joseph C. Dolihite
Case Number: 1:2022cv00922
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPPOSITION by G. Lopez to #9 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Bragg, R.)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Reply by Richard Joseph Crane. (Sant Agata, S)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Attempted, Not Known, Unable to Forward: #7 Order on Motion for Extension sent to Robert Andres Bonta. (Lawrence, A)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for 15-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Supplemental to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Richard Joseph Crane. (Flores, E)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(b) by Richard Joseph Crane. (Flores, E)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPPOSITION by G. Lopez to #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Bragg, R.)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FINDING Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Extension as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 08/22/2022. (Flores, E)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion for Extension served on Robert Andres Bonta, Richard Joseph Crane. (Flores, E)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION as Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b), (1), (2), (3) and (g); and Rule 81; 28 U.S.C. 1738 by Richard Joseph Crane. (Lawrence, A)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Opposition to Notice of Removal Application #1 , by Richard Joseph Crane. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBIT A to Notice of Removal by G. Lopez re #1 Notice of Removal. (Bragg, R.)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by G. Lopez (Bragg, R.)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 14C0180 by G. Lopez. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10349026) (Bragg, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Crane v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Joseph Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Lopez
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Tyler Vance Heath
Represented By: R. Lawrence Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Asuncion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Dolihite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?