(PC) Stith et al v. State of California, et al.
Plaintiff: Charlene Stith, Victoria Green, Tremaine Carroll, Jonathan Robertson, Fancy Moore Lipsey and Rayshawn Hart
Defendant: State of California, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Greg Rodriguez, Michael Pallares, White, Turnin, A.W. Dodson, Haynes, Brown, Sousa and Gensel
Case Number: 1:2023cv00947
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Charlene Stith.(Virgilio, Joseph)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Virgilio, Joseph)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Either Submit New Completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Bearing Plaintiff's Original Signature or Pay $402.00 Filing Fee in Full; ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/07/2023. Motion for IFP due by 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Maldonado, C)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Charlene Stith. (Xiong, J.)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Charlene Stith, CDCR No. W-92715 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER severing Plaintiffs' Claims and directing Clerk's Office to open new cases for Plaintiffs Victoria Green, Tremaine Carroll, Jonathan Robertson, Fancy Moore Lipsey, and Rayshawn Hart; 45-Day Deadline for all Six Plaintiffs Stith, Green, Carroll, Robertson, Lipsey, and Hart to each file an amended complaint in their own separate case not exceeding 25-pages total; Clerk to reflect on the Court's Docket that Plaintiffs Green, Carroll, Robertson, Lipsey, and Hart have been terminated from this case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form). (Lundstrom, T)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Charlene Stith. (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JONATHAN ROBERTSON. (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Fancy Moore Lipsey. (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by RAYSHAWN HART. (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Victoria Green. (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Tremaine Carroll. (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Charlene Stith (Virgilio, Joseph)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Charlene Stith.(Virgilio, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Stith et al v. State of California, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Stith
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Green
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremaine Carroll
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Robertson
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fancy Moore Lipsey
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayshawn Hart
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?