(PC) Robertson v. State of California, et al.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Robertson
Defendant: State of California, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Greg Rodriguez, Michael Pallares, White, Turnin, A.W. Dodson, Haynes, Brown, Sousa and Gensel
Case Number: 1:2023cv00975
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jonathan Robertson.(Virgilio, Joseph)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of ERRATA by Jonathan Robertson re #10 Amended Complaint.. (Virgilio, Joseph)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jonathan Robertson.(Virgilio, Joseph)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Virgilio, Joseph)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied re #2 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/5/2023. Referred to Judge de Alba. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Lawrence, A)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00975-ADA-SAB. (Lawrence, A)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jonathan Robertson. (Xiong, J.)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Jonathan Robertson, CDCR No. WB-1151 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER severing Plaintiffs' Claims and directing Clerk's Office to open new cases for Plaintiffs Victoria Green, Tremaine Carroll, Jonathan Robertson, Fancy Moore Lipsey, and Rayshawn Hart; 45-Day Deadline for all Six Plaintiffs Stith, Green, Carroll, Robertson, Lipsey, and Hart to each file an amended complaint in their own separate case not exceeding 25-pages total signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form). (Lundstrom, T)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jonathan Robertson. (Lundstrom, T)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Brown, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), A.W. Dodson, Gensel, Haynes, Michael Pallares, Greg Rodriguez, Sousa, State of California, Turnin, White by Jonathan Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Robertson v. State of California, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Robertson
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?