(PC) Rice v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rice
Defendant: Nicholas Gonzales, Robert Marquez, Daniella Roman, Amaini Varela, Thomas, M. Martinez, Tocong, Guerra, Crlara, Ja Michael and P. O. Williams
Case Number: 1:2023cv01094
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Return to Sender, Attempted-Not Known, Unable to Forward: #13 Order to Show Cause, sent to Nicholas Rice at PO Box 32080, Stockton, CA 95213. Notice of Change of Address due by 11/16/2023. (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should not be Dismissed, Without Prejudice, for Failure to Exhaust Prior to Filing Suit signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2023. Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days.(Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order to Show Cause, served on Nicholas Rice. (Sant Agata, S)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nicholas Rice.(Xiong, J.)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01094-ADA-BAM (PC). (Xiong, J.)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Xiong, J.)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Nicholas Rice. (Xiong, J.)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/26/2023. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Lawrence, A)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order served on Nicholas Rice. (Lawrence, A)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Trust Account Statement) (Lundstrom, T)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Nicholas Rice. (Lundstrom, T)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Nicholas Rice, CDCR No. BT-0216 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Xiong, J.)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Nicholas Rice. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:23-cv-1421-AC) to Fresno (1:23-cv-1094-BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/20/2023. (Huang, H)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Transfer Order, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Nicholas Rice. (Huang, H)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Clemente Licea, O)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Nicholas Rice. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Nicholas Rice. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Crlara, Nicholas Gonzales, Guerra, Robert Marquez, M. Martinez, Ja Michael, Daniella Roman, Thomas, Tocong, Amaini Varela by Nicholas Rice.(Clemente Licea, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rice v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniella Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaini Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tocong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crlara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ja Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. O. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?