(PC) Fenix v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Davon Fenix
Defendant: Gavin Newsom, Waddle and North Kern State Prison
Case Number: 1:2024cv00202
Filed: February 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for premissive joinder case by Davon Fenix. (Lundstrom, T)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Xiong, J.)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Davon Fenix (Xiong, J.)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Davon Fenix, CDCR No. BU-8979 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Xiong, J.)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Davon Fenix. (Xiong, J.)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Davon Fenix. (Xiong, J.)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSATF, P.O. Box 5244, Corcoran, CA 93212 by Davon Fenix. (Maldonado, C)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Davon Fenix. (Flores, E)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Davon Fenix. Address Remains the Same. (Flores, E)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to submit Application to proceed IFP or pay Filing Fee within 45-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 3/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Yin, K)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:24-cv-0444 JDP PC) to Fresno (1:24-cv-0202 SAB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/15/2024. (Yin, K)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Transfer Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Davon Fenix. (Yin, K)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 3/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Murphy, J)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Davon Fenix. (Murphy, J)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Gavin Newsom, North Kern State Prison, Waddle by Davon Fenix.(Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fenix v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davon Fenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Kern State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?