McNeal v. Fleming, et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Wayne McNeal
Defendant: Fleming, - Arnold, Hatley, Martin and Runnels
Case Number: 2:2002cv02524
Filed: November 21, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/14/18 GRANTING 393 Request for Transcripts at the government's Expense.(Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/22/18 DENYING without prejudice 391 Request for Transcripts. (Kaminski, H)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/30/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Vernon Wayne Macneal on 2/26/18 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2 before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve this order and writ on the custodian and out-to-court desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/2017 DENYING 324 Motion to Continue. (Hunt, G)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Plaintiff, Vernon Wayne McNeal 318 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/8/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/19/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Vernon Wayne McNeal #P-34419, to testify in USDC at 9:30 a.m. on 11/8/2017 in courtroom #9, before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: OTCD-SAC; SAB)(Yin, K)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/26/15 DENYING 271 Motion for Expert Witness Fees. (Manzer, C)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/14 ORDERING upon reconsideration, the order of the Magistrate Judge filed 10/27/14 289 , is AFFIRMED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/14 denying 280 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's request for authentication 288 is denied. (Plummer, M)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/16/2014 DIRECTING defendants to file a response to plaintiff's 280 motion to compel within 14 days. Plaintiff may file a reply to defendants' response within 14 days of the response. (Yin, K)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/2014. Plaintiff's 279 Objections were contrued by Court as Request for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Delaney's 277 Order denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. Court also finds that the ruling was not clearly erroneous and is therefore AFFIRMED. (Marciel, M)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER denying 276 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/24/14. (Plummer, M)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/06/14 ordering ( Jury Trial set for 1/12/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley.) If the parties wish to proceed to trial sooner, they should consider consenting to the undersigned. The clerk of the court is directed to send the parties the court's form for consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The parties shall complete the forms and return them to the court within 30 days. (Plummer, M)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/2/14 DENYING 268 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/16/2014 ORDERING the custodian to produce Vernon McNeal #P34419, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 5/6/2014 in courtroom #25, before Judge Kendall J. Newman; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: OTCD-SAC, KJN) (Yin, K)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 256 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/6/2013 ORDERING that the 1/13/14 trial before Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED; this matter will be set for settlement conference by subsequent order of court; within 14 days, each party shall inform the court in writing as to whether they wish to proceed with the settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney or if they wish to be referred to another Magistrate Judge; the Clerk shall send each party the consent form for settlement conferences; and plaintiff's 253 motion for a six month continuance of the trial date is DENIED as moot. (Yin, K)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/29/13: The deadline date given in the Pretrial Order for filing motions in limine is vacated. Any evidentiary or procedural motions (motions in limine) are to be filed by December 20, 2013. A jury trial is scheduled for January 13, 2014. The estimated length of trial is no more than three (3) days. (Kaminski, H)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/19/2013 GRANTING 249 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 1/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; VACATING all previously issued writs for the 6/10/2013 trial; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this Order on the Out-to-Court Desk and the Warden at California State Prison - Corcoran. (cc: Out-to-Court Desk) (Michel, G)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/24/2013 VACATING the 1/28/2013 Jury trial and CONTINUING it to 6/10/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. All previously issued writs are VACATED. Clerk to send copy of this order to the Out-to-court desk and the Warden of CSP- Corcoran. (Donati, J)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER denying plaintiff's 241 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Officer Batos, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/9/13. (Kastilahn, A)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/4/12 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Vernon Wayne at 9:00 am on January 28, 2013 in Courtroom 7 before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/30/12 DENYING 231 Request to Change Jury Trial to Bench Trial filed by Vernon Wayne McNeal. (Meuleman, A)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/6/2012 DENYING 224 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Michel, G)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/29/2012 DENYING, as moot, 220 Motion for copy of interview videotape. (Michel, G)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/15/12 ORDERING that within 10 days defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's 223 Reply. (Manzer, C)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/07/12 ORDERING that, within 15 days, defendants shall file and serve a response to plaintiff's 08/22/12 220 Motion; plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within 10 days thereafter. (Benson, A.)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/21/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 217 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/10/12 ORDERING that defendants' 212 motion to continue the trial date is GRANTED; and the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 9/10/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying 207 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/18/11. (Kaminski, H)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying 205 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/11. (Matson, R)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 [STRICKEN- PURSUANT TO 202 Minute Order] ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/11/10, ORDERING that The Full Release and Satisfaction of All Claims entered into by the parties as set forth in the Motion is approved as being in the best interest of all three minors. The proceeds from the AIG policy on deposit with the Clerk of Court, shall be paid as detailed in this Order.(Kastilahn, A) Modified on 6/14/2010 (Donati, J).
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/10/09 ADVISING pltf that the 196 motion will be DISREGARDED and no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Fleming, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Wayne McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleming
Represented By: Monica Noella Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Arnold
Represented By: Monica Noella Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatley
Represented By: Monica Noella Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Represented By: Monica Noella Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?