Magnan v. Runnels, et al

Plaintiff: Paul P Magnan
Defendant: David Runnels, M. S. Evans, Jeff Briddle, K Baughman, Rohlfing, - Knight, - Gillette, Roche, Cole, - Jackson, Laguna, - Tower, - Gunner, Omdudsman Chris Weaver, Martin and E. J. Schirmer
Unknown: Michael Holtsinger
Case Number: 2:2003cv01099
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/7/2011, and agreed between the parties to DISMISS w/ prejudice this entire action prusuant to Rule 41(a)(2). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/11 GRANTING 229 Motion for Extension of Time; parties have 45 days to stipulate to dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a). (Manzer, C)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/9/11 ORDERING that the stipulation to dismiss plaintiffs remaining claim against defendant Briddle pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall be filed no later than September 2, 2011. Plaintiff and defendant Briddle are relieved of their obligation to file pretrial statements.(Dillon, M)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 05/25/11 ordering the stipulation to dismiss plaintiff's remaining claim against defendant Evans shall be filed no later than 09/02/11. Plaintiff is relieved from filing a pretrial statement as it pertains to plaintiff's remaining claim against Evans. Defendant Evans is relieved from filing a pretrial statement. (Plummer, M)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/19/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's pretrial statement shall be filed within fourteen days. Defendants' pretrial statements shall be filed within fourteen days from service of plaintiffs. (Becknal, R)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/4/2011 ORDERING pltf's attorney's request for authority to incur costs regarding travel to the settlement conference is GRANTED.(Crouch, J)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/20/11 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is SET for 04/07/11 at 01:30 PM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. Confidential settlement conference statements are due by 03/28/11. (Benson, A.)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/16/2010. Settlement Conference set for 1/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 26 (KJM). Parties to provide Confidential Settlement Conference Statement to Sujean Park so they arrive no later than 1/5/2011. Pretrial Statement deadlines are VACATED and will be re-set, if necessary, after the Conference. (Marciel, M)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/2/2010 ORDERING that the 200 findings and recommendations filed September 29, 2010, are adopted in full. Defendant Briddle's 145 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to plaintiff's first cause of action and granted in all other respects. Plaintiff shall file his pretrial statement within twenty-one days. Defendant Briddle shall file his pretrial statement within fourteen days of service of plaintiff's.(Duong, D)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/28/10 recommending that defendant Briddle's motion for summary judgment 145 be denied as to plaintiff's first cause of action and granted in all other respects. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 145 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/22/10 RECOMMENDING that the 153 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied as to plf's first cause of action and granted in all other respects. Objections to these F&Rs due w/i 14 days; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Benson, A.)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/23/10 ordering the dismissal of David Runnels with prejudice.(Plummer, M)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/10/2010 ORDERING that dft Briddle's 144 motion to seal is GRANTED; and Exhibit C to Briddle's 1/27/10 declaration to be filed under SEAL. (Yin, K)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/10 ORDERING that Gillette and Rohlfing are dismissed with prejudice from this action.(Dillon, M)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/27/10 ORDERING that 174 Motion is DENIED ; The 5/12/10 Motion Hearing is continued to 6/9/2010 at 10:00 AM.(Dillon, M)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER on 172 Unopposed Ex Parte Applicaiton signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/15/2010 ORDERING that the hearing on the pending motions for summary judgment is CONTINUED to 5/12/2010; no further continuances absent extraordinary circumstances. (Yin, K)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/07/10 ordering that the hearings on all pending summary judgment motions be continued from 04/14/10 to 04/21/10. (Plummer, M)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/2010 ORDERING that the hearing on dft Briddle's motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to 3/31/2010. (Yin, K)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/14/09 ORDERING that the 7/22/09 motion to compel hearing is VACATED; the 134 motion to compel is DENIED. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnan v. Runnels, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul P Magnan
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Runnels
Represented By: Kathleen J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. S. Evans
Represented By: Kathleen J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Briddle
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Baughman
Represented By: Mark H Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohlfing
Represented By: Shanan L. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Knight
Represented By: Carrie Anne Frederickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Gillette
Represented By: Shanan L. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laguna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Gunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omdudsman Chris Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. J. Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael Holtsinger
Represented By: Carter Capps White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?