Holliday v. Sisto et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Holliday
Defendant: B. Naku, D. K. Sisto and Alvaro C. Traquina
Case Number: 2:2007cv01422
Filed: July 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/15/2010 ORDERING that dft's 45 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; pltf's 46 motion for summary judgment is DENIED; and the clerk to enter judgment in favor of dft and against pltf and to close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/04/09 ordering ( Discovery due by 2/1/2010. Any necessary motions to compel based on the new discovery requests must be filed on or before 04/01/10. Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2010.) (Plummer, M)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/03/09 ordering that any hearing dates currently set before the undersigned are vacated. It is further ordered that the clerk of the court reassign this case to the Honorable Craig M. Kellison. All future documents filed in the above-captioned case shall reference the following case number: CIV S-07-1422 CMK. (cc: LKK)(Plummer, M)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/17/09 and ORDERING that dft Naku's 22 Motion for Summary judgment is GRANTED; dft Naku is TERMINATED as a party to this action; and this case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings as to plfs claim against dft Traquina. (Benson, A.)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/20/09 DENYING 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliday v. Sisto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Naku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro C. Traquina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?