Morgande v. Tilton et al

Petitioner: Begoia Morgande
Respondent: James E. Tilton and D. K. Sisto
Case Number: 2:2007cv01824
Filed: September 6, 2007
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE of USCA as to 36 Motion for Certificate of Appealability: The judgment of this Court, entered 4/12/2012, takes effect this date. (Michel, G)
April 26, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Mary M. Schroeder on 4/25/2012 DENYING 39 Application for a Certificate of Appealability as moot. (Michel, G)
March 9, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Mary M. Schroeder on 3/9/2012 ORDERING 36 Morgande's motion to reopen the case is DENIED. In order that Morgande may seek review of this decision, Morgande's motion for a certificate of appealability is GRANTED on the issue of whether this court has the authority to reopen the time to appeal. (Reader, L)
January 13, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Mary M. Schroeder on 01/13/12 ORDERING that Petitioner's 34 motion to extend the time to file a notice of appeal is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
August 13, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Mary M. Schroeder on 8/13/09 ORDERING that petitioner's petition for writ of hc is DENIED. This case is dismissed and closed.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgande v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Begoia Morgande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?