Johnson v. Sisto et al
Plaintiff: George I. Johnson
Defendant: D. K. Sisto, R. Pennington, E Gums, Vela, V Singh, J. Boyden, J. Pearson, H. Hunter, C. D. Brown, J Ward and Cruz
Case Number: 2:2007cv01826
Filed: September 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 71 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/4/11. (Matson, R)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/18/10 denying 66 Motion to Set Aside the settlement agreement. This case is dismissed with prejudice on the parties stipulation. (Plummer, M)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/30/10 ORDERING that the parties are directed to file the dispositional documents within 30 days of the date of this order. (Dillon, M)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/2010 ORDERING that this case is set for mediation before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/13/2010 at 1:00 PM at CSP-SOL; parties to appear in full settlement authority; parties' co nfidential settlement conference statements due no later than 3/30/2010; Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas to file a report, w/in 20 days of settlement conference; the clerk to serve a copy of this order to ADR; the clerk is also to serve a courtesy copy of this order on CSP-SOL Litigation Office by fax. (cc: Judge Vadas, Sujean Park)(Yin, K)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/18/09 ORDERING that plf's 42 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; dfts' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to: dft s Hunter (Calvo), Ward, Brown and Sisto insofar as thecomplaint alleges denial of a religious diet; dfts Hunter (Calvo), Ward, Brown, Sisto and Cruz to the extent plf alleges he does not receive a vegan diet; dfts' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to: dft Cruz, insofar as the complaint alleges he denied plf a religious meal on 10/11/06; dfts' request that the claim for punitive damages be stricken. (Benson, A.)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/01/09 recommending that plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment 42 be denied; and Defendants' motion for summary judgment 32 be granted as to: Defen dants Hunter (Calvo), Ward, Brown and Sisto insofar as the complaint alleges denial of a religious diet; Defendants Hunter (Calvo), Ward, Brown, Sisto and Cruz to the extent plaintiff alleges he does not receive a vegan diet; and Defendants' mot ion for summary judgment 32 be denied as to: Defendant Cruz, insofar as the complaint alleges he denied plaintiff a religious meal on 10/11/06; and Defendants' request that the claim for punitive damages be stricken. Motions for Summary Judgment 32 , 42 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/14/09 ORDERING that pltf's 34 motion for extension of time is GRANTED; and pltf has 30 days to file and serve a response to dfts' 32 motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/9/2009 ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 Findings and Recommendations; 25 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by George I. Johnson is DENIED. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sisto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George I. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Gums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Boyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?