Manriquez et al v. Goodrum et al
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez Manriquez, Aldo Bacenas, Javier Vallejo Renteria, Amador Martinez Gonzalez, Fernando Cabrea Guzman, Eliazarb Rojas Blancas, Alejandro Sanchez Maldonado, Eddy Saul Ramos, Juan - Carrillo and Salvador Gomez Renteria
Defendant: Todd Goodrum, John Goodrum, Jela Investments Inc., Thomas Bangs and Platte River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv00880
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/12 recommending that this action be dismissed 1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. These findings and recommendations are submitted to the United States District Judgeassigned to the case. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Matson, R)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/12 ORDERING that the MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Plaintiffs' counsel James Dal Bon and his firm, Dunn, Dal Bon & Margin 58 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs will be deem ed proceeding pro se in this Action and any filings, notices, or correspondence shall be served upon them at the following addresses: Jose Gonzalez Manriquez, 1875 7th Street, Richmond, CA 94801 Aldo Bacenas, Linda Vista 273, Villada, 57710 Ciud ad Nezahualcoyotl, MEX, Mexico Javier Vallejo Renteria, 1956 Powell St., Apt. E, San Pablo, CA 94806 Amador Martinez Gonzalez, 520 20th Street, Richmond, CA 94801 Fernando Cabrera Guzman, 1857 7th Street, Richmond, CA 94801, and 2910 Denovo Way , San Pablo, CA 94806 Eliazarb Rojas Blancas, 3045 S. Drive, Richmond, CA 94804, and 3045 Sh Drive, Richmond, CA 94804 Juan Carrillo, 1958 North McDonald, Mesa, AZ 85201 Salvador Gomez Renteria, 1956 Powell St. Apt. E, San Pablo, CA 94806 E ddy Saul Ramos, 2428 Bartlett St., Oakland, CA 94601. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiffs. On or before 11/14/2012, Plaintiffs shall Show Cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecu te. Failure of Plaintiffs to respond to this OSC may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with court orders and this Court's Local Rules Attorney Jacob Sider; James Anthony Dal Bon and Tomas E. Margain TERMINATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/21/2011. In light of Mr. Dal Bon's representations, the Request for Extension of Time is GRANTED. On or before 8/19/2011, plaintiffs shall move for Default Judgment against remaining defendants and/or SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Marciel, M)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/25/2011 ORDERING that, on or before 6/13/2011, Pltfs shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Zignago, K.)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/30/11 ADOPTING 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDERING Defendants 9 answer stricken; DIRECTING CLERK to enter default against defendants Todd Goodrum andJohn Goodrum, dba Todd Goodrum Construction and Goodrum Builders; Plaintiffs are permitted to move for default judgment against defendants within 30 days from the date defendants default is entered. (Williams, D)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/1/2011 ORDERING that the final pretrial conference set for 2/9/2011 and the trial set for 4/12/2011 as VACATED; RECOMMENDING that 9 Answer to Complaint be STRICKEN due to defendants' fail ure to communicate with plaintiffs in order to prepare a joint pretrial statement and due to defendants' failure to comply with numerous court orders and this court's Local Rule; the Clerk be directed to enter default against defendants Tod d Goodrum and John Goodrum, dba Todd Goodrum Construction and Goodrum Builders; that plaintiffs be permitted to move for default judgment against defendants w/i 30 days from the date default is entered. Matter referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Waggoner, D)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/19/10 ORDERING that the Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 02/09/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan; a joint pretrial statement is due 01/26/11; on or before 12/15/10, dfts shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, why their answer to plfs' complaint should not be stricken and default entered against them due to their failures to communicate with plfs in order to prepare a joint pretrial statement, as required by the 38 09/28/10 order. (Benson, A.)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/21/2010 REFERRING this case to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan under Local Rule 302(c)(21). All pending dates are hereby VACATED. All future documents shall reference the following case number: CIV. S-08-0880 FCD EFB PS. (Krueger, M)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 33 signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/19/2010 ORDERING Defendants Thomas Bangs and Jela Investments Inc. DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party will bear their own costs. (Krueger, M)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/2/09 ORDERING that the parties hereby stipulate to submit to the VDRP mediation process. Case Referred to VDRP. (Becknal, R)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/13/09 ORDERING Platte River Insurance Company DISMISSED, with each party to bear its own costs. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manriquez et al v. Goodrum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez Manriquez
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Bacenas
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Vallejo Renteria
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amador Martinez Gonzalez
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Cabrea Guzman
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliazarb Rojas Blancas
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Sanchez Maldonado
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Saul Ramos
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan - Carrillo
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Gomez Renteria
Represented By: James Anthony Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Goodrum
Represented By: Sharon B. Futerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Goodrum
Represented By: Sharon B. Futerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jela Investments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bangs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte River Insurance Company
Represented By: Sharon B. Futerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?