Motley v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Edward Motley
Defendant: J. Smith, D. Peddicord, Beasley, R. Kemp, H. Wagner, T. Felker, R.K. Wong, S. Babich, E. Rausch, M. Wright, M. Townsend, N. Grannis, D. McGuire, J. Barron, Callison, R. Craddock, Stafford, M. Dangler, Holmes, D.L. Runnels, D. Jackson, D. Chapman, D. Rhodes, D. Zanchi, M. Carasco, Robinson, K. Sigston and Joe McGrath
Case Number: 2:2008cv01423
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 06/27/11 GRANTING 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
March 29, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 3/28/11: Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss and for summary judgment on or before May 17. 2011. (Kaminski, H)
December 9, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/09/10 ORDERING the Custodian to Produce EDWARD MOTLEY, inmate #H-56441, via telephonic conferencing at Salinas Valley State Prison on Wednesday, January 26, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept)(Williams, D) .
October 13, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/12/10. The warden of Salinas Velley State Prison is COMMANDED to produce Edward Motley to appear by tele-conferencing at Salinas State Prison on Wednesday, 12/08/10 at 9:00 a.m. (cc: 3 certified copies to Warden, Salinas Velley State Prison, P.O. Box 1020 Soledad, CA 93960) (Benson, A.)
August 11, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/10/10: Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 44 is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED, and Magistrate Judge Cooke's prior Report and Recommendation 20 is amended as recommended. (Kaminski, H)
July 21, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/21/10. The warden of Salinas Velley State Prison is COMMANDED to produce Edward Motley to appear by tele-conferencing at Salinas State Prison on Wednesday, 10/06/10 at 9:00 a.m. (cc: 3 certified copies to Warden, Salinas Velley State Prison, P.O. Box 1020 Soledad, CA 93960)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 19, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/16/2010 RECOMMENDING that Pltf's First Amendment retaliation claims against dfts Smith, Wright, and McGuire shall be allowed to proceed and that all other provisions of the report and recommendation shall stand as originally written and remain in full force and effect. Referred to Judge Roger L. Hunt. Objections to F&R due within 10 days. (Zignago, K.)
July 14, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICAMDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/14/2010 ORDERING that aWrit of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issue, under the seal of this court, commanding the Warden to produce the inmate Edward Motl ey to testify by tele-conferencing before the United States District Court on 7/15/2010 10:30am at Salinas Valley State Prison, and from day to day until completion of court proceedings or as ordered by the court. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (Duong, D)
June 24, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM 40 signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/23/2010 ORDERING: Commanding Warden, Custodian CSP Sacramento to produce the inmate before the Honorable Valerie P. Cooke,to appear by tele-conferencing at California State Prison on Wednesday, 7/14/2010 at 10:00 AM. for proceedings before the United States District Court. (cc: IT Dept, Warden CSP-Solano)(Reader, L)
December 30, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * Complaint * filed on * 6/20/09,* on * E. Rausch, M. Wright, D. McGuire, Callison, R. Craddock, D. Chapman, Joe McGrath, J. Smith, D. Peddicord, Beasley, R. Kemp, H. Wagner*, Service Deadline set for 5/3/2010 signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/30/09. The Court shall serve upon plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules of Court. (cc USM priority) (Becknal, R)
December 14, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/14/2009; Service documents and USM-285 Forms. Service is appropriate for H. Wagner. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copies of the Complaint filed on 6/20/2008, and R & R's 15 . Case Management Deadline: 1/19/2010. (Reader, L)
November 10, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/10/2009 ORDERING that service is appropriate for defendants J. Smith, D. Peddicord, Beasley, R. Kemp, E. Rausch, M. Wright, D. McGuire, Callison, R. Craddock, D. Chapman and Joe McGrath; Clerk shall send plaintiff 11 USM forms, summons, instructions and copy of the complaint; w/i 30 days from date of this order, plaintiff shall complete Notice of Submission of Documents and return documents for service by the USM. (Waggoner, D)
October 27, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/26/09. Plaintiff' claims are permitted to proceed, or dismissed, as stated therein. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motley v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Peddicord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Craddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.L. Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Zanchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Carasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Sigston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?