Rothery et al v Blanas et al

Plaintiff: James Rothery and Andrea Hoffman
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Lou Blanas, John McGinnis, Timothy Sheehan, Fred Mason, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department, Jerry Brown and Michael B. Mukasey
Case Number: 2:2008cv02064
Filed: September 2, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 46 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/19/2009. (Matson, R)
July 29, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WIHT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDNAT ATTORNEY GENERAL signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/28/09. defendant Attorney General's MOTION to dismiss the First Amended Complaint as to him is granted. The First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Plaintiffs' Countermotion for judgment on the pleadings as to defendant Attorney General is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 27, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/27/09 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend. (Engbretson, K.)
February 9, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/09 re 13 ORDERING that the dfts are GRANTED time including 4/2/09 to file their responsive pleadings. (Duong, D)
January 22, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/21/09 ORDERING that dfts County of Sacramento, John McGinness, Timothy Sheehan, Lou Blanas and Fred Mason have until 04/02/09 to respond to plf's complaint; the parties also agree to STAYING this current litigation until a decision is rendered by the USCA in Mehl, et al., vv. Blanas, et al. Case stayed. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothery et al v Blanas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rothery
Represented By: Daniel M Karalash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Hoffman
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Blanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?