Hertzig v. Yates

Petitioner: Timothy Donald Hertzig
Respondent: James Yates
Case Number: 2:2009cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 10/12/10 ORDERING Petitioners request for an order to show cause is DENIED AS MOOT; Petitioners request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED; and Petitioners request for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED; RECOMMENDING that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Denied. Objections to F&R's due within 21 days after being served. (Williams, D)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/4/09 DENYING 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/5/09 GRANTING 8 Application to proceed IFP.(Dillon, M)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/15/09 ORDERING that petitioner to submit on the form provided by the clerk w/in 30 days, a complete application for leave to proceed ifp, w/ certification or pay the appropriate filing fee; clerk to send petitioner a new ifp form; and petitioner's 2 motion/request for appointment of counsel is DENIED w/out prejudice to renewal after an answer to the petition has been filed. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hertzig v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Donald Hertzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?