Martinez v. Hoover, et al
Plaintiff: Archie A Martinez
Defendant: G. Hoover, J. C. Blim, Olivas, Sylvia Garcia, Kinip, M. D. Cook, B. Mann, Carlt, Gilkes, Snichman, L. Schultz, Monow, Parlimon, David S Clark, Grillo, Donald B. Thorton, Bulanon, Williams, Leullean, Dahmes, W. Hshimoto, Smith, R. Todd and Akintola
Case Number: 2:2009cv00680
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/18/2017 DISMISSING defendants G. Hoover, Morton, Olivas, Standford, Akintola and J. C. Blim from this action. (Hunt, G)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSDefendants. AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/6/17, ORDERING the Custodian to produce Archie A. Martinez at 9:00 a.m. on 10/18/2017 in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Ne wman. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-To-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Kastilahn, A)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/6/2017 APPOINTING David R. Johanson as attorney for Plaintiff for the limited purpose of settlement. (Donati, J)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/15/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 91 are not adopted; This matter is referred to Sujean Park, Pro Bono Coordinator for the EDCA, to seek the voluntary assistance of couns el for Plaintiff for the limited purpose of representing Plaintiff at a settlement conference to be set by subsequent court order; and This matter is STAYED except for appointment of counsel and setting of a court-convened settlement conference until after the conclusion of settlement proceedings.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/27/17 ordering that the document docketed as objections to findings and recommendations 92 is stricken as unsigned in violation of Rule 11. (Plummer, M)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/22/2016 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/7/2016 VACATING the 9/15/2016 findings and recommendations 88 . Plaintiff shall file a status report as previously ordered within 30 days; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a copy of teh 8/5/2016 order. (Yin, K)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/15/2016 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/5/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED; Plaintiff shall file a status report, within 20 days, informing the court what discovery he still needs to complete, how much time he needs to complete his discovery, and how much time he may need to file any dispositive motions he may file; and defendants shall file a status report, within 35 days, informing the court what discovery they need to complete, how much time they need to complete the discovery, and how much time is needed to file any dispositive motions.(Dillon, M)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/2013 GRANTING 76 Motion to Vacate and DENYING 79 & 80 Motions to Strike. A new scheduling order will be issued by the undersigned at the appropriate time. (Donati, J)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/30/13: The court declines to adopt the findings and recommendations 70 . This case is remanded to the magistrate judge to reconsider plaintiff's motion in light of this order. (Kaminski, H)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/31/12. On August 28, 2012, the court ordered plaintiff to pay to defendants, through their counsel, $3,503.96 as sanctions. The order is clarified in that such sanctions are required to be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply could result, on proper motion, in dismissal of the action as a further sanction.(Dillon, M)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/27/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for a stay of proceedings 61 is DENIED; Plaintiffs motions for the appointment of counsel 62 , 63 , and 65 are DENIED; Defendants motion to compel [66 ] is GRANTED; Plaintiff is ordered to attend his next properly noticed deposition; Plaintiff is ordered to pay to defendants, through their counsel, the sum of $3,503.96 as reasonable expenses under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(d)(3); The time to conduct discovery is extended to December 3, 2012; and Dispositive motions are due within 90 days from the discovery cut-off date. (Dillon, M)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/11/11 ordering plaintiff's motion for a referral to mediation is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/28/11 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 9/6/11 53 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS 32 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. This Action shall proceed on Pla intiff's excessive force retaliation and medical tratment claims. Defendant's MOTION to STRIKE 48 is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to file a surreply 49 and Request for additional time in which to do so 46 are DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/02/11 RECOMMENDING that the 32 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part as detailed in the order; that dft's 48 Motion to Strike be granted and that plf's 49 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply and 46 Request for Additional Time should be denied; Objections to these F&Rs due w/i 14 days; referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Benson, A.)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/2011 ORDERING that the 43 motion for reconsideration is DENIED as untimely. No further motions for reconsideration of the magistrate judge's August 16, 2010, or October 1, 2010, orders will be considered. (Duong, D)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/12/11 granting 42 Motion to rescind his consent. Plaintiff's consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate judge is deemed withdrawn. The clerk of the court shall randomly assign a district judge to this case and update the docket to reflect the new case number. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this action. The case number is 2:09-cv-0680 KJM CMK (PC). (Plummer, M)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/03/10 denying 39 Motion for a court order to access the law library. Plaintiff's response to the pending motion to dismiss shall be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/30/10 denying 31 Motion for Reconsideration of the order denying the appointment of or referral to counsel. (Plummer, M)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/14/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall promptly seek additional information sufficient to effect service on any unserved defendants and notify the court once such information is ascertained. (Dillon, M)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/13/10. (Plummer, M)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/30/10 ordering plaintiff's claims for deliberate indifference to his medical condition under the Eighth Amendment, related to the treatment for diabetes, are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Defendants Cook, Mann, Carh, Gilkes, Snichman, Schultz, Monow, Parlimon, Clark, Grillo, Thorton, Bulanon, Williams, Dahmes, Hashimoto, Naleboru and Lieullean are dismissed from this action. The clerk of th e court is directed to terminate Kinip, Smith, and Todd, as defendants on the docket, as they are not named in plaintiff's amended complaint. This action will proceed against defendants Hoover, Blim, Olivas, Garcia, Morton, Standford and Akintola only, as addressed by separate order.(Plummer, M)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/4/10. Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why these claims should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Dillon, M)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/22/09 ORDERING that pltf may file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Hoover, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie A Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Blim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parlimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B. Thorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leullean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dahmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hshimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akintola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?