Horton et al v. County of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Audrey Jones, Charles Rich, Shannon Eubanks, Daisy Lu Cornejo, Taylor Feigin, Grant Murray, Jennifer Graham, Francisco Chiquillo, Emmanuel Estrada, John Newsome, Tondalay Webb, Laura Papasian, Denise Easterling, Rudy Del Real, Taneya Davis, Monique Espitia, Tana Crowe, Dharmendra Pegany, Tomasa Kizer, Ryan Alligue, Salesa Faalau, Latrice Douglas, Laura Martinez, Aimee Lescallett, Jennifer Fritz, Carlo Cottengim, Paul Pham, Paul Nua, Jason Lenten, James Carey, Joseph Landenberger, Larino Lazo, Katrina Culverson, Brian Iniguez, Justin Tracy, Manpreet Dulai, Michel Ramirez, Stacy Berry, Amandeep Mann, Jason Stalder, Yesenia Felix, Christina Voyce, Keith Harrison, Joseph Torres, Gita Siroosmehr, Cortney Christopher, Michelle Ingoldsby, Ashlie Gray, Rajind Basi, Cheree Robinson, Brent Bugarin, Christina Crabtree, Mai Lee Yang, Marcel Bonaardd, Dianne Steele, Harry Dayduff, Melissa Dugan, Charles Lewis, Domina Mise, Karen Bautista, Gabo Ly, Matthew McClenahen, Monika Lopez, Leon Craft, Rachel Gomez, Sarah Ownbey, Jacob Cullers, Edward Fong, Arlena Mitrovic, Justin Gompert, Khalilah Gildersleeve, Diana Ellering, Yanett Guerrero, Robert Luna, Laura Barragan, Gregory Stuber, Logan Linares, Shannon Gasper, Sandy Do, Andrew Young, Marcos Diaz, Josh Moreno, Timothy Kuwazaki, Robin Boyle, Thomas Ballas, Latoya Taylor, Lindsay Tamagni, Alan Dang, Ross Haines, Pao Xiong, Paul Esteves, Ignacio Cervantes, Michael Banag, Alberto Cortes, Nicole DeLaRiva, James Sumner, Adam Frazier, David Thompson, Saul Arcos, Reagan Chan, Starlie Pines, Chelsi Burgess, Ronald Parker, Alan Blalock, Matthew Nava, Mitchell Lindsey, Shelley Kaiser, Jennie Koreen, Ruben DaSilva, Kalili Stallworth, Keyana Smith, Amani Jones, Randal Beebe, Francisco Recinos, Edith Arceo, Mia Castellanos, Yolanda Adams, Maria Fernandez, Mark Coleman, Joe Wilson, Cassie Jackson, Gregory Turner, Kristin Plain, Mycshia Hudson, Kenny Hee, Yolanda Abarca, David Cook, Kimberly Corley, Erica McGuire, Brian Ham, Patty Stiver, Michael Sanders, Charles Hines, Christina Chung, Jeffrey Levasseur, Arthur Cano, Rosalind Erby, Jason Somera, Alexander Taylor, Larry Mackey, Ramona Herrera, Abbie Hogg, Carlos Estrella, Jeffrey Horton, Jose Cervantes, Brittany Eveleth, James Terrell, Alan Bertuccelli, Eduardo Lopez, Chaka Wilson, Maria Griffitts, Sylvia Long, Michael Ocampo, Michael Boyce, Cossondra Deherrera, Alma Chavez, Dennis Hollar, James Ford, Jeff Gustafson, Dondi Decena, Peter Perez, Ray Ollie, Patrice Pratt, Shawn Xiong, James Wilson, Harbhajan Dass, Nadine Donaldson, Joseph Bellecci, Cristopher Jackson, Iohla Thomas and Zahra Lotfdlian
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2009cv00806
Filed: March 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C Damrell
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 6/3/2011 ORDERING #48 that Defendant County of Sacramento has up to and including 7/2/2011 within which to complete the payments under the terms of the Settlement. #47 (Reader, L)
June 2, 2011 Filing 48 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for /to Modify Deadline to Complete Payments by County of Sacramento. (Whitefleet, John)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER RE APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 04/18/11 ORDERING that the Settlement Agreement is APPROVED as fair, reasonable and just in all respects as to the plfs, and the Parties shall perform the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms; the Court reserves jurisdiction over this action for the purposes of enforcing the Settlement Agreement; the Court has made no findings or determination regarding the law, and this Stipulation and Order and any exhibits and any of the other documents or written materials prepared in conjunction with this Stipulation and Order shall not constitute evidence of, or any admission of, any violation of the law; this action is hereby DISMISSED w/ prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
April 15, 2011 Filing 46 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Executed Settlement Agreement, #2 Signatures A-H, #3 Signatures I-Z)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Reader, L).
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/14/11 ORDERING pltfs' motion to compel #37 is dropped from the 1/27/11 calendar; pltfs may re-notice their motion to compel if necessary. (Carlos, K) Modified on 1/14/2011 (Carlos, K).
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 1/14/2011 ORDERING that dispositional documents are to be filed by 4/15/2011. All dates/hearings set in this matter are VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
January 13, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Plaintiffs. (Edwards, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/14/2011 (Krueger, M).
December 16, 2010 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/16/2010 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Request for Continuance #41 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #37 set for 12/23/2010 is VACATED and RESET for 1/27/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Text Only)(Schultz, C)
December 16, 2010 Filing 41 REQUEST for Continuance of Hearing Regarding Discovery Agreement; [Proposed] Order by Plaintiffs. Attorney Edwards, Jeffrey Robert Alan added. (Edwards, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/16/2010 (Krueger, M).
December 14, 2010 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/14/2010: The Court has reviewed the parties Stipulation to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order filed on December 13, 2010 #39 . The dates provided by the parties conflict with Court's scheduling and calendar. Accordingly, the Court MODIFIES the scheduling dates as follows: Discovery shall be completed by February 10, 2011; Expert Witness Disclosures are due February 28, 2011; Expert Witness Rebuttals are due March 14, 2011; Expert Discovery is extended to April 14, 2011; Dispositive Motion deadline is set for June 24, 2011; the Final Pretrial Conference is reset for August 12, 2011 at 2:30 PM.; and the Jury Trial date is reset for October 4, 2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom #2. (TEXT ONLY) (Krueger, M)
December 13, 2010 Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification #36 Scheduling Order by plaintiffs. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 12/13/2010 (Kaminski, H).
October 12, 2010 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/12/2010 ORDERING that the hearing date of 12/22/2010 is unavailable. Accordingly, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Hearing re: Discovery Disagreement #37 will be held on 12/23/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Text Only)(Schultz, C)
October 11, 2010 Filing 37 SECOND AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #33 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing reset for 12/22/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Carr, James) Modified on 10/12/2010 (Reader, L).
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED STIPULATION #35 and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/8/2010: Discovery is EXTENDED to 1/10/2011. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses is now due by 1/28/2011 and Expert Witness Rebuttals due 2/14/2011. The last date to hear Dispositive Motions is 5/13/2011. Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 7/15/2011 at 01:30 PM and Jury Trial is RE-SET for 9/27/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD). (Marciel, M)
October 7, 2010 Filing 35 AMENDED STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to modify Pre-Trial Scheduling Order by County of Sacramento. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 10/8/2010 (Marciel, M).
October 7, 2010 Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for /to Modify Pre-Trial Scheduling Order by County of Sacramento. (Whitefleet, John)
September 22, 2010 Filing 33 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #31 MOTION to COMPEL, Production of Documents, Set One, and to Produce PMK for Deposition by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Carr, James) Modified on 9/23/2010 (Schultz, C).
September 21, 2010 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) by Crd for Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/21/10. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiffs' #31 MOTION to COMPEL Production of Documents, Set One, and to Produce PMK for Deposition filed September 21, 2010, is incorrectly noticed before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd and will not be placed on the October 22, 2010, calendar. This matter was reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on February 8, 2010 (#30). Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman at (916) 930-4193 for available civil law and motion dates. I HEREBY CERTIFY that the foregoing is a true and correct statement of an order made in the above-captioned case.(Buzo, P)
September 21, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION to COMPEL Production of Documents, Set One, and to Produce PMK for Deposition by plaintiff. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Attorney Carr, James B. added. (Carr, James) Modified on 9/22/2010 (Marciel, M). Modified on 9/23/2010 (Schultz, C).
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii ORDERING due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Future pleadings shall bear the case number 2:09-cv-806 FCD KJN. (Waggoner, D)
July 21, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name by all plaintiffs. (Mastagni, David)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/23/09 ORDERING that the #1 Complaint is replaced with the redacted version and UNSEALED. (Donati, J)
June 23, 2009 Filing 27 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Removal of Inadvertently Included Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 6/23/2009 (Donati, J).
June 4, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #26 Scheduling Order served on Isaac Sean Stevens. (Streeter, J)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 06/03/09: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/29/2010. Discovery due by 11/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. (Streeter, J)
May 22, 2009 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeffrey Horton. (Mastagni, David)
April 28, 2009 Filing 24 Defendant's ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by County of Sacramento. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added.(Whitefleet, John)
April 21, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE Consent to be included by Ray Ollie. (King, David)
April 20, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE Consent to be included by Manpreet Dulai. (King, David)
April 20, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE Consent to be included by Laura Papasian. (King, David)
April 20, 2009 Filing 20 [DISREGARD - See doc. #23 for correct image] NOTICE Consent to be included by Manpreet Dulai. (King, David) Modified on 4/27/2009 (Engbretson, K.).
April 20, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE Consent to be included by James Ford. (King, David)
April 17, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE Consent to be included by Paul Nua. (King, David)
April 13, 2009 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jeffrey Horton. County of Sacramento served on 4/10/2009, answer due 4/30/2009. (King, David)
April 10, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE Consent to be included - N-Z by all plaintiffs. (King, David)
April 10, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE Consent to be included H-M by all plaintiffs. (King, David)
April 10, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE Consent to be Included D-G by all plaintiffs. (King, David)
April 10, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE Consent to be included A-C by all plaintiffs. Attorney King, David Der added. (King, David)
April 10, 2009 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento by Jeffrey Horton.(King, David)
April 3, 2009 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/3/2009: Plaintiff's Motion #5 is DENIED as procedurally defective. Plaintiff may file a properly noticed motion to be heard on the Court's regularly scheduled law and motion calendar. (TEXT ONLY) (Krueger, M)
April 2, 2009 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lindsey Mitchell. (Mastagni, David)
April 2, 2009 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Alma Chavez. (Mastagni, David)
March 25, 2009 Filing 8 CONSENT to be included as an individual Plaintiff by Yolanda Adams. (King, David) Modified on 3/27/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 25, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Yolanda Adams re #6 Notice - Other - ATY, #5 MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. (King, David)
March 25, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Errata by Yolanda Adams re #5 MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. (King, David)
March 25, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents by Yolanda Adams. (King, David)
March 24, 2009 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1, #2 VDRP Forms) (Duong, D)
March 24, 2009 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *David E. Mastagni* *Mastagni Holstedt Amick Miller Johnsen & Uhrhammer* *1912 I Street* *Sacramento, CA 95811-3151*. (Duong, D)
March 24, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200015424 $350.00 fbo Jeffrey Horton et al by Kathleen R. Mastagni on 3/24/2009. (Duong, D)
March 20, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento by plts . Attorney Mastagni, David E. added.(Mastagni, David) Modified on 6/23/2009 (Donati, J). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2009: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (Donati, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton et al v. County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rich
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Eubanks
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Lu Cornejo
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Feigin
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Murray
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Graham
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Chiquillo
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Estrada
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Newsome
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tondalay Webb
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Papasian
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Easterling
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Del Real
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taneya Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Espitia
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tana Crowe
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharmendra Pegany
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomasa Kizer
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Alligue
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salesa Faalau
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrice Douglas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Lescallett
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fritz
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Cottengim
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pham
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nua
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lenten
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carey
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Landenberger
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larino Lazo
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Culverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Iniguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Tracy
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manpreet Dulai
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Ramirez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Berry
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amandeep Mann
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Stalder
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Felix
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Voyce
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Torres
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gita Siroosmehr
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Christopher
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ingoldsby
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlie Gray
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajind Basi
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheree Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Bugarin
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Crabtree
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mai Lee Yang
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Bonaardd
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Steele
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Dayduff
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dugan
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domina Mise
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bautista
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabo Ly
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McClenahen
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Craft
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Gomez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Ownbey
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Cullers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fong
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlena Mitrovic
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Gompert
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalilah Gildersleeve
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Ellering
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanett Guerrero
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Luna
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Barragan
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stuber
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Linares
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Gasper
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Do
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Young
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Diaz
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Moreno
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Kuwazaki
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Boyle
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ballas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Taylor
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Tamagni
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Dang
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Haines
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pao Xiong
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Esteves
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Cervantes
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Banag
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Cortes
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole DeLaRiva
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sumner
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Frazier
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thompson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Arcos
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reagan Chan
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starlie Pines
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsi Burgess
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Parker
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Blalock
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Nava
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Lindsey
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Kaiser
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Koreen
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben DaSilva
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalili Stallworth
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyana Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amani Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Beebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Recinos
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Arceo
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Castellanos
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Adams
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fernandez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Coleman
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Turner
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Plain
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mycshia Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Hee
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Abarca
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cook
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Corley
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica McGuire
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ham
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Stiver
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sanders
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hines
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Chung
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Levasseur
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Cano
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Erby
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Somera
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Taylor
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Mackey
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Herrera
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbie Hogg
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Estrella
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Horton
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cervantes
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Eveleth
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Terrell
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bertuccelli
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaka Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Griffitts
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Long
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ocampo
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boyce
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cossondra Deherrera
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Chavez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hollar
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ford
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Gustafson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dondi Decena
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Perez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Ollie
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Pratt
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Xiong
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbhajan Dass
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Donaldson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bellecci
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristopher Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iohla Thomas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Alan Edwards
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahra Lotfdlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?