June 21, 2011 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint Naming Doe Defendants in Case No. 2:09-CV-842, within twenty (20) days of this Order being electronically filed. The hearing, scheduled for June 23, 2011 before this Court, is hereby VACATED. (Becknal, R)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/2011 GRANTING 51 Defendants Motion to Consolidate Cases with 2:11-CV-353 MCE GGH; All pending dates in both actions are hereby VACATED; The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report in accordance with the requirements outlined within the Court's 3/31/2011 Order Requiring Joint Status Report in Case No. 2:11-CV-353-MCE-GGH(Reader, L)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
56
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/21/2011 ORDERING that defendant Evalyn Horowitz, MD is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/11 ORDERING the currently scheduled trial date of March 19, 2012 is hereby continued to June 25, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. An amended Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued setting forth other applicable deadlines consistent with that continued trial date. (Becknal, R)
|
March 31, 2011 |
Filing
49
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/31/11 ORDERING this case RELATED to 2:11-cv-353 JAM JFM; the action denominated 2:11-cv- 00353-JAM-JFM, Sandipkumar Tandel v. County of Sacramento, et al. is REASSIGNED to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only is hereby VACATED; the Clerk of the Court is to issue an Order Requiring Joint Status Report; henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:11-cv-00353-MCE-GGH. (Carlos, K)
|
March 7, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/7/11 ORDERING the parties' Stipulated Proctective Order is GRANTED with the following modifications: the substantive standards set forth by the Ninth Circuit for filing documents under sea l are found in Pintos v. Pacific Creditors Assn., 605 F.3d 665, 678 (9th Cir. 2010) and Phillips v. General Motors Corp., 307 F.3d 1206, 1210 (9th Cir. 2002). Procedurally, the parties must comply with E. D. Local Rules 141 and 141.1 regarding the sealing of documents. Any confidential material filed with the court, sealed or otherwise, will not be returned at the conclusion of the litigation. (Carlos, K)
|
February 8, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/7/2011 DENYING, without prejudice, parties' 44 Stipulated Proposed Protective Order subject to submission of proper Proposed Order. (Marciel, M)
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 07/24/09 ORDERING that Defendant Evalyn Horowitz, M.D.'s responsive pleading, which was due on 07/20/09, is continued to twenty (20) days after Plaintiff files and serves his first amended complaint; Plaintiff's first amended complaint shall be filed on or before 7/27/2009. The last day to complete service on all parties is extended to 8/27/09. (Manzer, C)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/09 ORDERING that Defendant County of Sacramento's responsive pleading, which was due on 6/26/09, is continued to twenty (20) days after Plaintiff files and serves his first amended complaint; Plaintiff's first amended complaint shall be filed on or before 7/27/2009. The last day to complete service on all parties is extended to 8/27/09. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|