Robles v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Group
Plaintiff: Dina M. Robles
Defendant: Kathy Thomas, Kaiser Permanente Medical Group and Ronnie Cook
Case Number: 2:2009cv02171
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/19/12 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own respective costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the file. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
October 12, 2012 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL of all parties with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael) Modified on 10/15/2012 (Michel, G).
October 11, 2012 Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), Plaintiff must submit a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal for the Court's consideration. Plaintiff's counsel is also reminded to comply with Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in WordPerfect or Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. (Deutsch, S)
October 9, 2012 Filing 50 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of action with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael) Modified on 10/9/2012 (Michel, G).
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/1/2012 ORDERING that the deadline for filing dispositional documents is CONTINUED to 10/15/2012. (Zignago, K.)
October 1, 2012 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Stipulation and Proposed Order for Continuing Date to File Dispositional Documents #47 . Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in WordPerfect or Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in word processing format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
September 27, 2012 Filing 47 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuing date to file dispositional documents by Kaiser Permanente Medical Group. (Hawkins, Matthew)
August 28, 2012 Filing 46 MINUTES for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/28/2012: Parties reached a verbal settlement agreement. All parties agreed to the terms of the settlement agreement as stated for the record. Dispositional documents due within 30 days. Any and all other future hearings and deadlines are VACATED. Plaintiffs Counsel Randy Harvey and Michael Wilcox present. Defendants Counsel Matthew Hawkins present. ECRO/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/03/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's #25 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part; plaintiff's discovery requests at issue shall be modified to reflect that they are limited to calling for the requested documents only for the time period from 08/25/05-08/25/09, and to documents implicating defendant Thomas' treatment of or interactions with other employees; and defendant shall produce the responses to plaintiff by 08/20/12, subject to an appropriate stipulated protective order. (Benson, A.)
August 3, 2012 Filing 44 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 8/3/2012 re #25 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Dina M. Robles. Court noted disagreement with dfts' position that the sought after documents to the extent it is agreed that the requests are now limited to Ms. Thomas' records and relevance is limited only to document's reflecting allegations of religious discrimination against Ms. Thomas. Request is not unduly burdensome or harassing. Court noted any privacy concerns, with respect to Ms. Thomas, can be addressed through a stipulated protected order, and any privacy concerns with respect to any other individuals can be addressed through a stipulated protected order or redactions.Court authorized term of three year period preceding pltf's termination and one year after: 8/25/2005 through 8/25/2009, and limitation on all the requests that the documents to be produced were only those which implicate Ms. Thomas' treatment of and or interactions with other employees. After hearing of arguments, pltf's #25 Motion to Compel granted in part and denied in part as stated on the record in open court. Dfts' shall produce requested documents by 8/20/2012. Court not inclined to conduct an in camera review. Court adopted order as modified in open court. Court to issue brief summary order. Plaintiffs Counsel Michael Wilcox present. Defendants Counsel Matthew Hawkins present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Jonathan Anderson/1. (Buzo, P)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/13/12 ORDERING the discovery cut-off reset to 8/20/2012; and the #25 Motion to Compel Reset for 8/3/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Becknal, R)
July 16, 2012 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Loura N. Erickson re #41 Declaration. (Hawkins, Matthew)
July 13, 2012 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Michael S. Wilcox in SUPPORT OF #25 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wilcox, Michael)
July 13, 2012 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by Dina M. Robles in SUPPORT of #25 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. (Wilcox, Michael)
July 5, 2012 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order #38 . Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in WordPerfect or Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in word processing format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
July 5, 2012 Filing 38 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Futher Modifying Pretrial Scheduling by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael)
June 29, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #25 Motion to Compel. Hearing RESET for 07/20/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Wilcox, Michael)
May 23, 2012 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/23/2012: Informing the parties that a Settlement Conference has been set for 8/28/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven days prior to this settlement conference. These statements be shall simultaneously delivered to the Court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the Court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). (TEXT ONLY)(Caspar, M)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/21/2012 MODIFYING the #20 Pretrial Scheduling Order, EXTENDING the deadline for Discovery to 8/1/2012; GRANTING the Request to set a Second Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Newman in or about August, 2012. (Michel, G)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/15/2012 ORDERING Attorney Michael S. Wilcox and Randy J. Harvey for Dina Robles, instead of Harvey & Wilcox. (Reader, L)
April 11, 2012 Filing 33 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2012 (Zignago, K.).
April 3, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Scheduling Order by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/26/2011 ORDERNG Jury Trial CONTINUED to for 1/22/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; trial briefs due by 11/15/2012; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/29/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Joint final pretrial statement due by 11/8/2012, and shall comply with the procedures outlined in the Court's 6/3/2010 pretrial scheduling order; evidentiary or procedural motions due by 11/8/2012; Opposition by 11/15/2012, and any replies due by 11/22/2012.(Reader, L)
August 23, 2011 Filing 30 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Kaiser Permanente Medical Group. (Hawkins, Matthew)
August 23, 2011 Filing 29 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael)
July 26, 2011 Filing 28 MINUTES for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/26/2011: CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiffs Counsel Michael Wilcox present. Defendants Counsel Matthew Hawkins, Robert Falsetti present. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
July 19, 2011 Filing 27 Defendants' NOTICE OF FILING Confidential Settlement Conference Statement (Local Rule 270(d)). (Hawkins, Matthew) Modified on 7/20/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 10, 2011 Filing 26 WITHDRAWAL of #25 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Dina M. Robles. (Wilcox, Michael)
May 27, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to COMPEL Discovery Responses by Dina M Robles. Motion Hearing set for 06/17/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Wilcox, Michael)
April 20, 2011 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by CRD A. Rivas for District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The parties are hereby notified that the settlement conference currently set for June 27, 2011, before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton is VACATED. The matter is now set for Settlement Conference on July 26, 2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Counsel is instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present at the Settlement Conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven (7) days prior to this settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the Court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the Court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). (Rivas, A)(Rivas, A)
March 16, 2011 Filing 23 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Michael Scott Wilcox for Dina M Robles (Wilcox, Michael)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/18/2010. (Matson, R)
August 13, 2010 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Ronnie Cook, Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Kathy Thomas. (Hawkins, Matthew)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/2/2010 ORDERING Discovery due by 6/23/2011; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/23/2011; Dispositive Motions filed by 8/11/2011; Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2012 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/23/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Matson, R)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): The parties have agreed to a settlement conference. Within seven (7) days from the date of this Minute Order, the parties are to file a waiver of disqualification, pursuant to Local Rule 270(b), before a settlement judge can be assigned to the case. Absent the parties' affirmatively requesting that the assigned Judge or Magistrate Judge participate in the settlement conference AND waiver, pursuant to Local Rule 270(b), a settlement judge will be randomly assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/17/2010. (Espana-Purpur, A)
April 19, 2010 Filing 17 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Kathy Thomas, Ronnie Cook, Kaiser Permanente Medical Group. (Hawkins, Matthew)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): Pursuant to the Order Requiring Joint Status Report filed on 8/6/2009, a joint status report should have been filed within sixty (60) days of service of the complaint on all parties that includes the Rule 26(f) discovery plan. A review of the docket shows that no report has been filed. Accordingly, a Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 4/19/2010, with all parties participating. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on any defendant who has not yet appeared. The parties are reminded that failure to file a joint status report, in a timely manner, may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/30/2010. (Espana-Purpur, A)
November 19, 2009 Filing 15 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AMENDED) by Kathy Thomas, Ronnie Cook, Kaiser Permanente Medical Group. Attorney Hawkins, Matthew Karl added.(Hawkins, Matthew)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/19/09 GRANTING an extention of time; answer to second amended complaint due on or before 11/19/09. (Owen, K)
October 14, 2009 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kaiser Permanente Medical Group. (Hawkins, Matthew)
October 2, 2009 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Summons: Please disregard, this summons was issued in error. (Matson, R)
October 2, 2009 Filing 11 **DISREGARD**SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kaiser Permanente Medical Group* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Randy Harvey* *1415 L Street* *Suite 1000* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Matson, R) Modified on 10/2/2009 (Matson, R).
September 29, 2009 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Dina M Robles.(Harvey, Randy)
September 22, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kathy Thomas, Ronnie Cook* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Randy J. Harvey* *Randy J. Harvey, PC* *1415 L. Street, Suite 1000* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Duong, D)
September 21, 2009 PARTY UPDATE: Kathy Thomas, and Ronnie Cook added. (Duong, D)
September 21, 2009 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente Medical Group by Dina M Robles. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Harvey, Randy)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/28/09 ORDERING that defendant THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. is granted an extension of time to and including October 1, 2009, in which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff DINA ROBLES' Complaint on file herein. (Becknal, R)
August 26, 2009 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Kaiser Permanente Medical Group. Attorney Hawkins, Matthew Karl added. (Hawkins, Matthew) Modified on 8/27/2009 (Reader, L).
August 6, 2009 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 6, 2009 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kaiser Permanente Medical Group* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Randy Jay Harvey* *Randy J. Harvey, P.C.* *1415 L Street, Suite 1000* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 6, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200018956 $350.00 fbo Dina M Robles by Randy Jay Harvey on 8/6/2009. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 6, 2009 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against all defendants by Dina M Robles.(Harvey, Randy)
August 6, 2009 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dina M Robles (Harvey, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina M. Robles
Represented By: Michael S. Wilcox
Represented By: Randy Jay Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Thomas
Represented By: Matthew Karl Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Group
Represented By: Matthew Karl Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Cook
Represented By: Matthew Karl Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?