Lee v. Bureau of Prisons, et al

Petitioner: Terrence Brownlee
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons and Board of Prisons
Case Number: 2:2009cv02521
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/18/2011 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 69 are ADOPTED in FULL; the 68 motion for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction is DENIED; and the court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28:2253. (Reader, L)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/13/10 ORDERING that Pltf's 70 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice to a renewal of the motion at a later stage of the proceedings. (Owen, K)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/19/10 recommending that the moton for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction be denied. MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 68 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/10/10 ORDERING that all outstanding motions are DENIED; recommending that this action be dismissed re 14 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrence Brownlee. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/21/10 ORDERING that petitioner's 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Owen, K)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/1/09 ORDERING that petitioner's 9 and 10 motions to proceed IFP are GRANTED. (Yin, K)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/15/09 ORDERING petitioner to submit, w/in 30 days, a complete ifp application, w/ certification, or pay the appropriate filing fee; and the clerk to send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Sacramento Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/8/2009. The new case number is 2:09-cv-02521-CMK.(Figueroa, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Bureau of Prisons, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrence Brownlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?