February 12, 2015 |
Filing
138
ORDER granting 137 Motion to quash the writ signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/11/15. (Kaminski, H)
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing
134
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/5/15 ORDERING that plaintiff Hunt is GRANTED a writ of execution against defendant Fields for the unpaid balance, $400, of the judgment entered on January 30, 2014, including the bill of costs entered on June 24, 2014. The Clerk's Office is directed to send to plaintiff a Form EJ-130. In order to effectuate the writ, the plaintiff is directed to complete the form and return it to the Clerk's Office for filing. (Kastilahn, A)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
128
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/30/2014 DENYING Plaintiff's 123 motion for declaratory and injunctive relief, 124 motion for a judgment as a matter of law, and 125 motion for a new trial. (Zignago, K.)
|
January 27, 2014 |
Filing
109
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/27/14 ORDERING Mr. Hunt to make up to two (2) telephone calls on the evening of Monday, January 27, 2014, for the purpose of facilitating his preparation for trial, scheduled now to begin on Tuesday, January 28, 2014. (cc CDCR ) (Becknal, R)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing
95
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/15/14 ordering the custodian to produce Michael A. Hunt via telephonic conferencing on 1/23/14 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento) (Plummer, M)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/15/14 re 87 MOTION to for additional time to submit an amended pretrial statement and for trial preparation. The court REQUESTS counsel for defendant file any response to this request within 5 days of the date of this order. (Meuleman, A)
|
December 26, 2013 |
Filing
86
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/25/2013 ORDERING 79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney iS GRANTED, Attorney David M Poore terminated; and 80 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. (Waggoner, D)
|
December 24, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/24/13 ordering the custodian to produce Michael A. Hunt via telephonic conferencing at 1/09/14 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 3 before District Judge K imberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento)(3 certified copies sent to the Warden, CSP-Solano)(Courtesy copy sent by fax to CSP Solano at (707) 454-3429) (Plummer, M)
|
February 8, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/07/13 David M. Poore is appointed as pro bono counsel in this matter. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on David M. Poore, Brown, Poore, LLP, 1350 Treat Boulevard, Ste 400, Walnut Creek, CA 94597. (Plummer, M)
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/5/2012 ORDERING The court's order 59 is VACATED; the findings and recommendations 58 are ADOPTED in FULL; Plaintiff's 35 motion for summary judgment is DENIED; Defendant's 45 mot ion to dismiss and for summary judgment is GRANTED in PART, and DENIED in PART as outlined in the F & R's, and leaving at issue plaintiff's retaliation claim in connection with the 8/28/2008 work re-assignment; and this case is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for setting a further schedule for trial on the remaining retaliation issue. (Reader, L)
|
September 27, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/12 ADOPTING IN FULL 58 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 35 Motion for Summary Judgment ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 45 Motion for Summary Judgment, as outlined in the findings a nd recommendations, leaving at issue plaintiff's retaliation claim in connection with the 8/28/08 work re-assignment; and this case is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for setting a further schedule for trial on the remaining issue. (Meuleman, A)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/10/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 52 motion to strike is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 35 motion for summary judgment be denied; defendant's 45 motion to dismiss and for summary judgment be denied in part and granted in part, as outlined in these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/26/12 granting 49 Motion for court to review documents and file them under seal as to exhibit B to defendant's statement of undisputed facts, page 1 through 12 and pages 14 through 16; and denied as to page 13. The clerk of the court is directed to seal the case doucments submitted by defendants as Exhibit B to defendant's statement of undisputed facts, pages 1 through 12 and pages 14 through 16, until they are ordered unsealed by the court. Defendant is to file and serve page 13 of Exhibit B to defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts on plaintiff within 7 days of this order. (See order for further details). (Plummer, M)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/11/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff shall have 21 days to supplement his opposition, if he chooses to do so. No extensions shall be provided.(Yin, K)
|
December 23, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/15/11 GRANTING 44 Motion for Extension. Defendant is GRANTED two court-days, to and including 12/19/11 to file a motion for summary judgment. (Donati, J)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/24/11 ORDERING that Plaintiffs 30 motion to file a second amended complaint is DENIED; Plaintiffs 33 motion for sanctions is DENIED; Defendants 32 Request to Respond to the Courts Order Issued 7/11/11 Beyond Time is GRANTED; and Defendants 39 motion to strike plaintiffs motion for summary judgment as untimely is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court shall address the remaining, pending motion for summary judgment ( 35 , 36 , 37 ) after completion of briefing on the motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment by defendant.(Dillon, M)
|
July 11, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/8/11 ORDERING that 24 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part (see order for details); As to those requests for which plaintiffs motion has been granted, defendant will have 21 days to serve her supplemental responses/production and to file proof of service thereof in this court. Defendant may not, in her amended responses, raise untimely objections to any of the requests that are the subject of this order.(Dillon, M)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/1/10 granting 21 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The discovery deadline shall be forty five days from the date this order issues. (Dillon, M)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/20/10 granting 19 Motion for leave to file additional interrogatories. Within 14 days of this order, plaintiff is to serve 12 additional interrogatories on defendant Fields. Pursuant to the Discovery and Scheduling Order, responses to written discovery requests shall be due 45 days after the request is served. (Plummer, M)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/31/2010 ORDERING that The 17 findings and recommendations filed July 26, 2010, are adopted in full. Defendant Walker is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Duong, D)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing
17
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/26/10 recommending that defendant Walker be dismissed with prejudice re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Michael A Hunt. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/7/10 ORDERING that 11 Motion to Amend the Complaint is VACATED; the amended complaint is DISMISSED with 28 days leave to file a second amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
7
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/11/10 ORDERING that the Warden of California State Prison-Sacramento or a designee shall collect and forward monthly payments from the prison trust account of Michael A. Hunt until the total amount of $350 is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's in forma pauperis affidavit to the Warden, California State Prison-Sacramento. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
|