February 11, 2014 |
Filing
143
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/10/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 140 , 141 , 142 motions for the trial transcripts at government expense. Plaintiff may renew his request with the Ninth Circuit by filing a motion in that court if he wishes. (Yin, K)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
128
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/9/13 denying 118 Motion for legal assistance.(Dillon, M)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
115
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/05/13 ordering the Custodian to produce Troy Cooper at 10/15/13 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
|
February 28, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER denying 100 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/27/13. (Plummer, M)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
94
AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/8/2013 ORDERING that this shall amend the 91 writ issued on 10/18/2012; the custodian is to produce Troy Cooper at 1/17/13 at 12:00 p.m. i n courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison; the custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ; the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: CMK and OTCD)(Yin, K)
|
October 18, 2012 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/12 ordering ( Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison.) (cc: CMK) (Plummer, M)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/24/12 granting 88 Motion to allow parties to file supplemental briefing on defendants' motion for summary judgment. Within 30 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff may file su pplemental oppositions, including evidentiary materials, to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Within 15 days of the date of service of plaintiff's supplemental oppositions, if any, defendants may file supplemental replies. (Plummer, M)
|
July 6, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/5/2012 ORDERING that within 21 days, each party shall inform the court in writing as to whether they wish to proceed with the settlement conference before the undersigned magistrate judge or if they wish to wish to be referred to the court's mediation program; the clerk to send each party the consent form for settlement conferences.(Yin, K)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER adopting in full 78 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 7/2/12. Defendant Naku's 64 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendant Naku is DISMISSED from this action; and this matter is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings with respect to plaintiff's claims against defendant Dr. Chen. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 4, 2012 |
Filing
78
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/1/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 64 motion for summary judgment be granted; defendant Naku be dismissed from this action; and this matter be referred back to Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd for futher proceedings with respect to plaintiff's claims against defendant Dr. Chen. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/23/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 69 motion pursuant to Rule 56(d) is DENIED; Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of service of this order to file an opposition to defendant Nakus motion for summary judgment and motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Alternatively, if plaintiff no longer wishes to proceed in this action against defendant Naku, he may file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this defendant; and defendant Naku may file a reply, if any, within seven days of service of plaintiffs opposition.(Dillon, M)
|
March 16, 2012 |
Filing
71
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/16/2012 ADOPTING 63 Findings and Recommendations in full, with exception; GRANTING 36 , 64 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's 14th Amendment due process claim; GRANTING 36 as to Defendant Kaur's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's 8th Amendment claim; DENYING 36 as to Defendant Chen's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's 8th Amendment claim. (Michel, G)
|
February 1, 2012 |
Filing
63
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/31/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 36 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part; and plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendement due process claim be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/18/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 57 is denied. (Becknal, R)
|
January 6, 2012 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/05/12 ordering plaintiff's motion pursuant to Rule 56(d) 44 is denied. Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of service of this order to file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants may file a reply, if any, within 7 days of service of plaintiff's opposition. (Plummer, M)
|
August 5, 2011 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/04/11 ORDERING dfts to lodge a copy of plf's deposition w/i 10 days as indicated in 37 Notice of Lodging. (Benson, A.)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/14/11 DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; GRANTING 39 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 60 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve a response to defendants motion for summary judgment. (Dillon, M)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/08/11 ordering plaintiff's 03/01/11 request to attempt re-service 29 is granted. The court's 03/03/11 findings and recommendations 31 are vacated. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff 1 summons, instruction sheet, 1 USM-285 form and a copy of the amended complaint to be completed and returned with the notice of submission of documents within 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/2/11 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court to randomly assign a District Judge to this action; RECOMMENDING that defendant Naku be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/20/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 4/30/10 APPLICATION to proceed IFP 2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. The fee shall be colle cted and paid in accordance with this court's order to the Director of the CDC and Rehabilitation filed concurrently herewith; Service of the complaint is appropriate for the following defendants: Kaur, Chen. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff two U SM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed 4/30/10. Within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents and submit it to the court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|