Garrison v. Tilton et al
Plaintiff: |
James Erin Garrison |
Defendant: |
James Tilton, Scott Kernan, James Yates and Arnold Swartzennegger |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01080 |
Filed: |
May 3, 2010 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
14
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/08/11 ordering this action is dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
12
ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/9/11 ORDERING plaintiff shall w/in 14 days file a completed IFP or pay the filing fee; Plaintiff shall also w/in 14 days show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; the Clerk to send a new IFP application; and failure to timely comply w/this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice.(Matson, R)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/29/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days after service of this order, on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, a completed affidavit in support of his request to procee d in forma pauperis, including a completed Certificate or Certified Trust Account Statement signed by an authorized officer, or plaintiff shall submit the $350.00 filing fee. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner, as used in this District. Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days after service of this order, an amended complaint that demonstrates the administrative exhaustion of his claims. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank Civil Rights Complaint By a Prisoner, as used in this District. (Dillon, M)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?