Jackson v. Cates, et al
Plaintiff: Midel Jackson
Defendant: Mathew Cates, Cano, Zapata, Lopes, De La Cruz, Romero, Anices, - Desimone, Furr, - Fredrick, Parerra, Petit, - Spangler, Cohn, Alvin Zachariah, Palagummi, T. Islas and P. Aquilizan
Case Number: 2:2010cv02070
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/28/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. MOTION to DISMISS 47 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/1/2012 ORDERING that, within 21 days, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the 47 motion to dismiss or a statement of no opposition. (Yin, K)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/7/11 GRANTING 42 Motion to Compel, and plaintiff shall provide responses to the interrogatories, requests for admission, and requests for production of documents described in the motion to co mpel and this order within 30 days of the date of service of this order. Further, plaintiff shall submit to deposition by defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30. Defendants July 27, 2011 request for attorney fees incurred in filing the motion to compel is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/13/11 ORDERING that, within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion to compel or a statement of no opposition. Failure to comply with this order will be deemed a waiver of any opposition to the granting of the motion.(Becknal, R)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/06/11 ordering defendants' request to plaintiff's deposition by videoconference 36 is granted. Defendants' request to modify the scheduling order 37 is granted and the sched uling order is modified as follows: Defendants shall have up to and including 08/01/11 to depose plaintiff and any witnesses he identifies in his testimony or to file any motions to compel plaintiff to respond to defendants' discovery requests. (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/07/11 vacating 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The case shall proceed according to the discovery and scheduling order issued on 03/07/11. (Plummer, M)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/24/11 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/14/10 ORDERING that plaintiffs claims against defendants Cates, Furr, Fredrick, Parerra, Spangler, Colon, and Islas are dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/15/10: Within 30 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff must either: (1) submit an amended complaint complying with the order of October 27, 2010 or (2) inform the court via the a ttached "Amended Notice of Submission of Documents" form that he wishes to proceed forthwith against defendants Cano, Zapata, Lopez, Della Cruz, Romero, Anices, Desimone, Zachariah, Petit, Palagummi, and Aquilizan and consents to dismissal of defendants Cates, Furr, Fredrick, Parerra, Spangler, Colon, and Islas without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Midel Jackson signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/10. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the Clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Finacial)(Plummer, M)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/10/2010 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days to submit the required trust acct statement; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp form. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Cates, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Desimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Fredrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Zachariah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palagummi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Islas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Aquilizan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?