Mester v. Kelso, et al
Plaintiff: Morris Mester
Defendant: Kelso, Swingle, French, Adbur Rahman, Clark and - Lankford
Case Number: 2:2010cv02105
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/7/2011 DENYING pltf's 63 motion for preliminary injunction. The court notes that it will issue no response to future filings by pltf in this action not authorized by the F. R. Civ. P. or F. R. A. P.. (Yin, K)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/28/11 ORDERING that w/in 15 days of the date of this order, defendants may file and serve a document stipulating to dismissal of this action without prejudice. In the event that defendants so stipulate, the court will construe the parties' filings as stipulation of dismissal for voluntary dismissal without prejudice.(Matson, R)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/2/11 ORDERING 30 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; Defendants Kelso and Lankford are dismissed without prejudice. (Matson, R)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/20/2011 DIRECTING the clerk to serve a courtesy copy of these F&Rs on Richard B. Price, and RECOMMENDING that pltf's 3 , 5 , 7 , 10 , 12 , 13 , 17 , 18 , 24 , 26 , 32 , 34 , 35 , 36 , 38 , 39 , 40 motions for a preliminary injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/15/2010 DENYING 32 Plaintiff's Motion for appointment of counsel. (Reader, L)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/8/2010 recommending that defendants Kelso and Lankford be dismissed without prejudice; objections to the findings and recommendations may be filed w/i 14 days from date of service; Matter referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Waggoner, D)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/9/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Morris Mester to the clerk until the balance of $350 is pai d in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/11/10 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days from the date of service of this order to submit eitherthe filing fee or the application to proceed IFP. Clerk to mail to plaintiff an IFP form.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mester v. Kelso, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Mester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adbur Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?